United States of America v. $13,000 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $13,000 in U.S. Currency and $86,168.42 Seized from SEFCU Bank Account ending in xxx959
Case Number: 1:2019cv00770
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
2 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE by Publication of Notice of Civil Forfieture; Last publication date August 10, 2019; in www.forfeiture.gov for 30 consecutive days last date to file a claim pursuant to publication will be September 9, 2019 filed by United States of America (Katz, Adam)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN: PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN: filed on behalf of the by United States of America. Type of Process: Forfeiture - Service of the Complaint, Warrant for Arrest and Third Party packet sent to William Dickson by certified mail regarding the $13,000 in United States Currency. (jmb, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN: filed on behalf of the by United States of America. Type of Process: Forfeiture - Service of the Complaint, Warrant for Arrest and Third Party packet sent to Mark J. Sacco, Esq., on behalf of William Dickson by certified mail on 7/25/2019 regarding the $13,000 in United States Currency. (jmb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN: filed on behalf of the by United States of America. Type of Process: Forfeiture - Service of the Complaint, Warrant for Arrest and Third Party packet sent to Mark J. Sacco, Esq., on behalf of Andy Dickson by certified mail on 7/25/2019 as to the $13,000 in United States Currency. (jmb)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN: Type of Process: Forfeiture - Arrest filed by United States of America. $13,000.00 in US Currency is in US Marshal Service custody since 2/22/2019 and the $86,168.42 in US Currency is in US Marshal Service custody since 3/5/2019. (jmb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF ARTICLES IN REM: Returned Executed by the United States Marshal Service on 7/22/2019. (jmb)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL - That, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned disqualifies himself from presiding over this matter. That the Clerk shall reassign this matter to another District Judge. That the matter has been randomly reassigned to Senior District Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr.. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 7/16/2019. (jel, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT FOR ARREST of Articles in Rem issued. {Electronically certified copy sent to the Attorney Adam J. Katz for use with service/publication}. (jmb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM: against $13,000 in U.S. Currency and $86,168.42 seized from SEFCU Bank Account ending in xxx959 filed by United States of America. Filing Fee Waived. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $13,000 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $13,000 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $86,168.42 Seized from SEFCU Bank Account ending in xxx959
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Adam J. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?