Mayer v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Karen Mayer
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00836
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed letter motion to hold pretrial deadlines in abeyance, which is granted. All pretrial deadlines, including mediation related deadlines, adjourned at this time and will be reset if the parties are unable to consummate their settlement. Plaintiff to file status report on settlement by 11/18/2019, or a stipulation of discontinuance as soon as the settlement is finalized if completed before that date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/9/2019. (sg)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Karen Mayer (Slade, Patrick)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation: Deadline for Mediator Selection is 9/25/2019. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 2/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/28/2019. (sg)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5 days, to be held in Utica NY. Rule 33 and 34 Requests to be served by 9/27/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2020. Mandatory Mediation deadline 2/28/2020. Discovery due by 8/3/2020. Discovery motions due 8/10/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 10/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/28/2019. (sg )
August 27, 2019 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/27/2019. Appearances: Patrick Slade, Esq. for Plaintiff; Alice Chan, Esq. and William Baaki, Esq. for Defendant. Court reviews Civil Case Management Plan. Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures completed by both parties. Plaintiff to serve original signed medical authorizations on defendant by 9/6/2019. Stipulated protective order to be submitted for Court approval by 10/18/2019. If parties are unable to stipulate, then each party is to file their own proposed order with cover letter indicating where their order differs by 10/18/2019. Case referred into Mandatory Mediation. Pretrial deadlines are established, a scheduling order and mediation referral order will be issued. (sg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN JOINT by American Airlines, Inc.. (Chan, Alice)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Karen Mayer Jury Demand (Slade, Patrick)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Slade on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Slade, Patrick)
July 30, 2019 TEXT NOTICE RE: TIME CHANGE OF R. 16 INITIAL CONFERENCE: Due to a conflict on the Court's schedule the TIME ONLY of the 8/27/2019 telephone R. 16 Conference has been CHANGED to 11:00 AM on that date. Counsel should make a note of the time change. (sg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice Chan on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (Chan, Alice)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Airlines, Inc.. (Baaki, William)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by American Airlines, Inc..(Baaki, William)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party American Airlines, Inc.; Attorney Alice Chan, Email address is alice.chan@changrant.com. Phone number is (646)779-2988. Admissions due by 7/26/2019. (Sent to attorney via regular mail)(meb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 10:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/20/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to the #1 Notice of Removal, filed by American Airlines, Inc. (meb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Schenectady County Supreme Court, case number 2019-1247 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4796970) filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certificate of Service)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayer v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Mayer
Represented By: Patrick D. Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Baaki
Represented By: Alice Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?