Genao v. Basilica Saint Patricks
Plaintiff: Elvin Genao
Defendant: Basilica Saint Patricks
Case Number: 1:2019cv00912
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:19-cv-07679, filed 08/16/2019. (amt)
August 13, 2019 Case transferred electronically to the Southern District of New York pursuant to the Dkt. No. 5 Order Transferring Case dated 8/13/2019. (hmr)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York: that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of the Court shall transfer this action to the United States District Court, Southern District of New York and close the file. The Court hereby waives the ten (10) day waiting period provided for in Local Rule 83.6; and that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff in accordance with Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 08/13/2019. (Copy served upon Elvin Genao at 237 West 127th St. Apt. 14C, New York, NY 10027 via regular mail on 8/13/2019.)(hmr)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket.So Ordered by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 08/09/2019. (Copy served upon Elvin Genao at 237 West 127th St., Apt. 14C, New York, NY 10027 via regular mail on 8/9/2019.)(hmr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Elvin Genao. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (hmr)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 7/30/2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(jel, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Basilica Saint Patricks filed by Elvin Genao. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genao v. Basilica Saint Patricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basilica Saint Patricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvin Genao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?