Varney v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Varney
Defendant: Glens Falls Hospital and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01107
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for United States of America answer due 11/13/2019. (dpk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Notice/Filing Order served on USA c/o U.S. Attorney General on 09/11/2019, filed by Crystal Varney. (Bottar, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Notice/Filing Order served on USA c/o U.S. Attorney, N.D.N.Y. on 09/13/2019, filed by Crystal Varney. (Bottar, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Notice/Filing Order served on Glens Falls Hospital on 09/13/2019, filed by Crystal Varney. (Bottar, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT re #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Glens Falls Hospital. (Haskins, Courtney)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against United States of America by Glens Falls Hospital.(Haskins, Courtney)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (jmb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Glens Falls Hospital. (dpk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to the U.S. Attorney General)(dpk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/2/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Glens Falls Hospital and the United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4864080) filed by Crystal Varney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varney v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glens Falls Hospital
Represented By: Courtney M. Haskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Varney
Represented By: Michael A. Bottar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?