DOE v. Smith
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Defendant: John Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv01121
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Proposed by JANE DOE. (Vinci, Gabrielle)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Rule 16 Initial Conference is RESCHEDULED as to TIME ONLY and is now set for November 7, 2019 at 11:00 AM before the undersigned. Counsel are directed to appear IN PERSON at the James T. Foley US Courthouse, 445 Broadway, 4th Floor, Room 409, Albany, NY on the scheduled date and time. Counsel are also directed to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures on or before October 31, 2019. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/18/2019. (mab)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter is RESCHEDULED for November 7, 2019 at 10:00 AM before the undersigned. Counsel are directed to appear IN PERSON at the James T. Foley US Courthouse, 445 Broadway, 4th Floor, Room 409, Albany, NY on the scheduled date and time. Counsel are also directed to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures on or before October 31, 2019. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/18/2019. (mab)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by John Smith.(Saccocio, Patrick)
September 27, 2019 ***Answer deadline set for John Smith on 10/9/2019. (kmp)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Linda Doe on 09/18/2019, filed by JANE DOE. (Vinci, Gabrielle)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Bernstein on behalf of JANE DOE (Bernstein, Stuart)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Protective Order filed by JANE DOE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Vinci, Gabrielle)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In Person Rule 16 Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/2/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Smith. (kmp)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against John Smith (Filing fee $400 receipt number BNYNDC-4866301) filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: Andrew Miltenberg
Represented By: Gabrielle M. Vinci
Represented By: Stuart Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Represented By: Patrick J. Saccocio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?