Perkins v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Bonnie Perkins
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs, United States of America and Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 1:2019cv01148
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), as to Defendants, United States of America and Department of Veterans Affairs. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 10/21/2019. (pjh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America submitted to Judge Hurd. (Folster Lesperance, Karen)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Folster Lesperance on behalf of All Defendants (Folster Lesperance, Karen)
September 17, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #2 Summons Issued as to USA, the Clerk modified the event to replace the summonses to include the Clerk's signature stamp. Clerk also issued summons to USA through the Attorney General. Copies sent to attorney Anderson and support staff Hurley via email. (kmp)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/9/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jel, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Department of Veteran Affairs, United States of America., Summons Issued as to Department of Veteran Affairs, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 as to defendant Department of Veteran Affairs)(jel, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/17/2019) (kmp, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/17/2019) (kmp, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #2 Summons Issued for US through the Attorney General) (kmp, ).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Veteran Affairs, United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4871799) filed by Bonnie Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Karen Folster Lesperance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Karen Folster Lesperance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Perkins
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?