Sheeran v. Aramark Facility Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Sheeran
Defendant: Aramark Facility Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01218
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aramark Facility Services, LLC.(Lunetta, Kimberley)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aramark Facility Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aramark for Aramark Facility Services, LLC.. (Lunetta, Kimberley)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: granting #6 Letter Request. The time for defendant Aramark Facility Services, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 11/15/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/12/2019. (nmk)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Kimberley E. Lunetta for Aramark Facility Services, LLC requesting extension of time to respond to the complaint to November 15, 2019 submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn . (Lunetta, Kimberley)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: On 10/28/2019, plaintiff filed proof of service asserting that the summons and complaint were served upon the defendant on 10/3/2019. The time for defendant to file an answer or otherwise move has expired. Pursuant to Local Rule 55.1, plaintiff may request a clerk's entry of default or, in the alternative, plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 11/13/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/6/2019. (nmk)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Verified Complaint and General Order #25 served on Aramark Facility Services, LLC on October 3, 2019, filed by Michael Sheeran. (Foust, Kristin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial telephone Conference set for 12/30/2019 10:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/23/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aramark Facility Services, LLC. (pjh)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Aramark Facility Services, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4888563) filed by Michael Sheeran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheeran v. Aramark Facility Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Facility Services, LLC
Represented By: Kimberley E. Lunetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sheeran
Represented By: Kristin Foust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?