International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19 et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Darren Longway and International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01238
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Nikki Lynn McArthur on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (McArthur, Nikki)
November 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Chiavetta on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Chiavetta, Thomas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Munro on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Munro, Donald)
November 8, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Roney, Susan)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nikki McArthur, Esq. for CSX Transportation, Inc. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/8/2019. (sg )
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nikki Lynn McArthur Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4936148. filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan C. Roney, Esq., #2 Petition for Admission to Practice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Roney, Susan)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Chiavetta, Esq. for CSX Transportation, Inc. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/4/2019. (sg)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donald Munro, Esq. for CSX Transportation, Inc. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/4/2019. (sg)
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas R. Chiavetta Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4930318. filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan C. Roney, Esq., #2 Petition for Admission to Practice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Roney, Susan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Donald J. Munro Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4930251. filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan C. Roney, Esq., #2 Petition for Admission to Practice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Roney, Susan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Roney, Susan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan C. Roney on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Roney, Susan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Bartos on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bartos, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Grunert, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Grunert, John)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on CSX Transportation, Inc. served on Sattie Jairam, Authorized Recipient on October 18, 2019, filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19, Darren Longway. (Grunert, John) Main Document 11 replaced on 10/29/2019 document contained additional pages that were inadvertently uploaded (pjh)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of John Grunert, Esq. for Plaintiff. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/16/2019. (sg)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey Bartos Esq. for Plaintiffs. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/16/2019. (sg)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19, Darren Longway re #7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of John J. Grunert Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4906915. (LaClair, Brian)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of John J. Grunert Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4906915. filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19, Darren Longway. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Oath of Admission, #4 Petition for Admission to Practice, #5 Certificate of Good Standing, #6 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (LaClair, Brian)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19, Darren Longway re #5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey A. Bartos Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4906913. (LaClair, Brian)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey A. Bartos Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4906913. filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19, Darren Longway. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Oath on Admission, #4 Petition for Admission to Practice, #5 Certificate of Good Standing, #6 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (LaClair, Brian)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Attorney Jeffrey A. Bartos and Attorney John J. Grunert. Email address is jbartos@geclaw.com. Phone number is 202-624-7400. Admissions due by 10/22/2019. {Clerk served a copy of Notice on both attorneys on 10/8/2019 via regular mail}(pjh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 1/6/2020 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/30/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc. (pjh)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against CSX Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4898796) filed by International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19 and Darren Longway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19 et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Longway
Represented By: Brian J. LaClair
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers District Lodge 19
Represented By: Brian J. LaClair
Represented By: John J. Grunert, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Susan C. Roney
Represented By: Nikki Lynn McArthur
Represented By: Donald Munro
Represented By: Thomas R. Chiavetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?