Anderson et al v. City of Gloversville
Plaintiff: James C. Anderson, David C. Rackmyre and Robert Davis
Defendant: City of Gloversville
Case Number: 1:2019cv01241
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Gloversville. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Service)(Shahan, Steven)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Shahan on behalf of City of Gloversville (Shahan, Steven)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order #25 served on Tarra Meher, Deputy City Clerk, City of Gloversville on October 21, 2019, filed by James C. Anderson, Robert Davis, David C. Rackmyre. (Tuttle, James)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER approving #4 Stipulation and extending the time for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to 12/6/2019. Plaintiff is directed to file affidavit of service by 11/13/2019. Attorney Shahan is directed to file a notice of appearance in the case. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/8/2019. (sg)
November 8, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for City of Gloversville answer due 11/12/2019. (kmp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by City of Gloversville submitted to Judge Dancks. (Shahan, Steven)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Rule 16 Conference set for 1/10/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/3/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of Gloversville. (kmp)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Gloversville. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4900586) filed by James C. Anderson, Robert Davis, and David C. Rackmyre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent as to James C. Anderson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent as to Robert Davis, #3 Exhibit 3 - Consent as to David C. Rackmyre, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. City of Gloversville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Anderson
Represented By: James B. Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Rackmyre
Represented By: James B. Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Davis
Represented By: James B. Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Gloversville
Represented By: Steven C. Shahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?