The New York State Nurses Association v. Albany Medical Center
Plaintiff: The New York State Nurses Association
Defendant: Albany Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv01265
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Request, approving Stipulation. Albany Medical Center answer due 1/9/2020. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/5/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The Initial Conference is reset for 2/12/2020 @ 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/13/2019. (tab)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 Letter Motion from Sanjeeve K. DeSoyza for Albany Medical Center requesting Extension of Time to Anser or Otherwise Respond submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment)(DeSoyza, Sanjeeve)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas P. Jacobson on behalf of Albany Medical Center (Jacobson, Nicholas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. D'Ambrosio, Jr on behalf of Albany Medical Center (D'Ambrosio, Nicholas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjeeve K. DeSoyza on behalf of Albany Medical Center (DeSoyza, Sanjeeve)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The New York State Nurses Association. Albany Medical Center served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Hahn, Marie)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie B. Hahn on behalf of The New York State Nurses Association (Hahn, Marie)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Hudson-Plush on behalf of The New York State Nurses Association (Hudson-Plush, Evan)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The New York State Nurses Association. (Vitale, Joseph)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/13/2020 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/6/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Albany Medical Center. (khr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albany Medical Center (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4907060) filed by The New York State Nurses Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The New York State Nurses Association v. Albany Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany Medical Center
Represented By: Sanjeeve K. DeSoyza
Represented By: Nicholas P. Jacobson
Represented By: Nicholas J. D'Ambrosio, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New York State Nurses Association
Represented By: Joseph J. Vitale
Represented By: Marie B. Hahn
Represented By: Evan Hudson-Plush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?