Lancaster et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christina A. Lancaster and George E. Lancaster
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC., Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01377
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
2 Judge: Miroslav Lovric
3 Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Priscilla Jimenez on behalf of Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster (Jimenez, Priscilla)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/4/2019. (jdp, )
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/4/2019. (jdp, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TEXT ORDER: The Parties/Counsel are directed to, no later than 1/6/2020, review the NDNY docket in this case and to also confer with the clerk's office to make certain that all documents, pleadings, court orders, court decisions, and other pertinent filings from the MDL district----- Ethicon MDL in SDWV are properly docketed, included, or referenced on the NDNY docket. It is the responsibility of counsel to make certain that pertinent docket entries from the MDL district have been carried over or referenced in the NDNY docket. Counsel should notify the court clerk if any additional docket entries from the MDL district need to be added to this docket or referenced in this docket. Counsel are directed to coordinate with the court clerk to accomplish and complete this no later than 1/6/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/3/2019. (jdp )
December 3, 2019 Filing 92 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 1:30 PM at 15 Henry Street, Binghamton, NY before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/29/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #86 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. To the extent that the parties have previously exchanged Mandatory Rule 26 Disclosures in the Ethicon MDL litigation and coordinated proceedings in SDWV, they are not required to duplicate and exchange such disclosures and materials again in this district. But if Mandatory Rule 26 Disclosures were not exchanged by the parties in the MDL litigation, for whatever reason, the parties are directed to comply with such disclosures per directive previously issued by this Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/3/2019. (jdp )
December 2, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Balefsky on behalf of Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster (Balefsky, Lee)
November 25, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by John K. Powers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Powers, John)
November 25, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura M. Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jordan, Laura)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Upon review of this case, it was determined that this case is directly related to case Cathy Balura, et al. v. Ethicon, Inc., et al., 3:19-cv-1372 (LEK/ML). In the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Lawrence E. Kahn and Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric for all further proceedings. District Judge David N. Hurd and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart are no longer assigned to this case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 11/25/2019. (sal )
November 25, 2019 Filing 86 Letter Motion from Defendants for Ethicon Inc., Ethicon, LLC., Johnson & Johnson requesting Relief from Rule 26 Obligations submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart, U.S.M.J. . (Kabbash, Maha)
November 21, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Priscilla Jimenez. Filing fee $100, receipt number ALB011571 filed by Christina A. Lancaster and George E. Lancaster. Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (dpk)
November 21, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lee Balefsky. Filing fee $100, receipt number ALB011567 filed by Christina A. Lancaster and George E. Lancaster. Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (dpk)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TEXT ORDER granting #82 Letter Request. The Attorney Admission deadline is stayed pending the issue with PACER being resolved. In the meantime, counsel are directed to promptly file the motions for pro hac vice traditionally, together with the filing fee. So Ordered by Judge David N. Hurd on 11/21/2019. (see)
November 20, 2019 Filing 82 Letter Motion from Laura M. Jordan, Esq. for Christina A. Lancaster requesting Notice of filing difficulty submitted to Judge Hon. David N. Hurd . (Jordan, Laura)
November 8, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Maha M. Kabbash on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Kabbash, Maha)
November 8, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly S. Crawford on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Crawford, Kelly)
November 8, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Withdrawal (Crawford, Kelly)
November 8, 2019 Filing 78 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/6/2020 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/30/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (plp, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendants; Attorney William M. Gage, Esq., Email address is william.gage@butlersnow.com. Phone number is 601-985-4561. Admissions due by 11/21/2019. (plp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendants; Attorney Laura H. Dixon, Esq. Email address is laura.dixon@butlersnow.com. Phone number is 601-985-4584. Admissions due by 11/21/2019. (plp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendants; Attorney Kari L. Sutherland, Esq., Email address is kari.sutherland@butlersnow.com. Phone number is 901-680-7354. Admissions due by 11/21/2019. (plp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendants; Attorney Diana Katz Gerstel, Esq., Email address is dgerstel@riker.com. Phone number is 973-451-8468. Admissions due by 11/21/2019. (plp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendants; Attorney Susan M. Robinson, Esq., Email address is srobinson@tcspllc.com. Phone number is 304-414-1801. Admissions due by 11/21/2019. (plp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendants; Attorney Philip J. Combs, Esq., Email address is pcombs@tcspllc.com. Phone number is 304-414-1800. Admissions due by 11/21/2019. (plp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendants; Attorney David B. Thomas, Esq., Email address is dthomas@tcspllc.com. Phone number is 304-414-1800. Admissions due by 11/21/2019. (plp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendants; Attorney Christy D. Jones, Esq., Email address is christy.jones@butlersnow.com. Phone number is 601-948-5711. Admissions due by 11/21/2019. (plp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiffs; Attorney Priscilla E. Jiminez, Esq., Email address is priscilla.jiminez@klinespecter.com. Phone number is 215-772-1000. Admissions due by 11/21/2019. (plp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiffs; Attorney Michelle L. Tiger, Esq., Email address is michelle.tiger@klinespecter.com. Phone number is 215-772-1000. Admissions due by 11/21/2019. (plp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiffs; Attorney Lee B. Balefsky, Esq., Email address is lee.balefsky@klinespecter.com. Phone number is 215-772-1000. Admissions due by 11/21/2019. (plp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 66 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-01271. electronically transferred when case opened
October 28, 2019 Filing 65 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (3592) MOTION to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, M.D._Part1, #2 (3592) MOTION to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, M.D._Part2, #3 (3594) MEMORANDUM in support of MOTION to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, M.D., #4 (3788) MEMORANDUM in opposition to MOTION to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, M.D, #5 (3845) REPLY in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, M.D., #6 (4863) Notice of Adoption of Prior Motion to Exclude Dr. Suzanne Parisian, #7 (4909) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Dr. Suzanne Parisian, #8 (5024) Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Suzanne Parisian, #9 (2759) Defendants Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, PH.D., #10 (2760) Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, PH.D., #11 (2949) MEMO by ALL Plaintiffs in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, Ph.D., #12 (3017) REPLY by Ethicon in Support of Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, PH.D., #13 (4862) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, PH.D. Wave 6, #14 (4910) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Peggy Pence, PH.D. Wave 6, #15 (5025) Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Peggy Pence, PH.D. Wave 6, #16 (2817) D Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., #17 (2818) Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., #18 (4374) D mte Rosenzweig, #19 (4375) D memo in support MTE Rosenzweig, #20 (4632) Reply to Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, MD, #21 (4875) Dft Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 (4880) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 (4977) Plt Memo in Opposition - Motion to Exclude Gen Opinions of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 (5027) Dft Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Gen Opinions - Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 64 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 2050-PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF UNICOLE FLEISCHMANN, M.D., #2 2060-PLAINTIFFS DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF FDA EXPERT TIMOTHY ULATOWSKI, #3 2081-PLAINTIFFS DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO LIMIT THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DEBRA FROMER, M.D., #4 2169-PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF MICHAEL THOMAS MARGOLIS, M.D., #5 2223-MEMORANDUM IN REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF MS. ELAINE DUNCAN, #6 2455-PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. SHELBY THAMES, #7 2455-PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. SHELBY THAMES pt 2, #8 2458-MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF DR. SHELBY THAMES, #9 2841-MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR LIMIT THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. SHELBY THAMES, #10 2904-PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO EXCLUDE AND NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF PRIOR DAUBERT MOTION AND REPLY OF MICHAEL THOMAS MARGOLIS, M.D. FOR WAVE 3, AND PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PRIOR DAUBERT MOTION, #11 2949-PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE PEGGY PENCE, PH.D., #12 3037-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF DR. SHELBY THAMES, #13 3767-PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PROF. DR. MED. UWE KLINGE pt 1, #14 3767-PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PROF. DR. MED. UWE KLINGE pt 2, #15 3767-PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PROF. DR. MED. UWE KLINGE pt 3, #16 3767-PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PROF. DR. MED. UWE KLINGE pt4, #17 3788-PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE DR. SUZANNE PARISIAN, M.D., #18 4977-PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN GENERAL OPINIONS OF BRUCE ROSENZWEIG, M.D.)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 63 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (3855) REPLY IN SUPPORT of Motion to Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge by Ethicon, #2 (4833) Notice of Adoption of Ethicon Motion to Exclude - Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge Wave 4, #3 (4904) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Resp of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge Wave 6, #4 (5034) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply re Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge Wave 6, #5 (2029) MOTION by Ethicon to Exclude CERTAIN OPINIONS OF MICHAEL THOMAS MARGOLIS, M.D., #6 (2031) MEMO by Ethicon in support of MOTION for Michael Thomas Margolis by Ethicon Women, #7 (2169) P opposition to D MTE Dr. Margolis, #8 (2212) REPLY Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Michael Thomas Margolis, #9 (2832) Dfts Supp Motion to Exclude and Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion and Reply Brief of Michael Thomas Margolis, M.D. for Wave 3, #10 (2833) MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude and Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert of Michael Thomas Margolis, #11 (2904) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude and Notice of Adoption of Michael Thomas Margolis, #12 (4857) Dft Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motions and Reply - Michael Margolis, MD, #13 (4905) Notice of Adoption of PriorDaubert Response of Michael Margolis, MD Wave 6, #14 (3019) Reply in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Dr. Suzanne Parisian)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 62 CONTINUED DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (5020) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Timothy Ulatowski Wave 6, #2 (3619) MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part1, #3 (3619) MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part2, #4 (3619) MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part3, #5 (3619) MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev_Part4, #6 (3621) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part1, #8 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part2, #9 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part3, #10 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part4, #11 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part5, #12 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part6, #13 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part7, #14 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part8, #15 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part9, #16 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part10, #17 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part11, #18 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part12, #19 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part13, #20 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part14, #21 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part15, #22 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part16, #23 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part17, #24 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part18, #25 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part19, #26 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part20, #27 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part21, #28 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part22, #29 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part23, #30 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part24, #31 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part25, #32 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part26, #33 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part27, #34 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part28, #35 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part29, #36 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part30, #37 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part31, #38 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part32, #39 (3790) RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs in opposition to MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., et al. to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev - Part33, #40 (3865) REPLY IN SUPPORT of Motion to Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Vladimir Iakovlev, MD. by Ethicon, #41 (4820) Notice of Adoption of Dft Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Vladimir Iakovlev, #42 (4902) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Vladimir Iakovlev, MD Wave 6, #43 (5032) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply re Vladimir Iakolev, MD Wave 6, #44 (3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge - Part1, #45 (3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge - Part2, #46 (3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge - Part3, #47 (3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge - Part4, #48 (3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge - Part5, #49 (3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge - Part6, #50 (3626) MOTION by Ethicon To Limit the Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge - Part7, #51 (3630) MEMO In Support of Motion to Limit Testimony of Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 61 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 (239) MASTER ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT ETHICON, INC. TO FIRST AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT, #3 (241) MASTER ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND OF DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JOHNSON TO FIRST AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT, #4 (262) Short Form Complaint, #5 (263) Amended Short Form Complaint, #6 (2033) P MTE Dr. Elaine Duncan, #7 (2036) P memo in support MTE Dr. Duncan, #8 (2155) D Response to mte Dr. Duncan, #9 (2223) P reply to D opp to MTE Dr. Duncan, #10 (4923) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Elaine Duncan, #11 (4984) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Elaine Duncan, MD, #12 (4809) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Elaine Duncan, MD, #13 (2050) P MTE Dr. Nicole Fleischmann, #14 (2051) P Memo in support of MTE Dr. Fleischmann, #15 (2159) D memo in opp to MTE Dr. Fleischmann, #16 (2230) P reply in support of MTE Dr. Fleischmann, #17 (4956) Defense Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Resp of Nicole Fleischmann, MD, #18 (4987) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Nicole Fleischmann, MD, #19 (4814) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Nicole Fleischmann, MD, #20 (2081) P Daubert motion to exclude Debra Fromer, #21 (2151) D memo in support of opposition to P MTE Fromer, #22 (4933) Defense Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Resp of Debra Fromer, MD, #23 (4815) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Debra Fromer, MD, #24 (2039) Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Shelby Thames, #25 (2042) MEMO by All Plaintiffs in support of MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Dr. Shelby Thames, #26 (2187) RESPONSE by Ethicon in opposition to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames, #27 (2247) REPLY in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Shelby Thames, #28 (2455) Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Shelby Thames, #29 (2458) MEMO by All Plaintiffs in support of MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames, #30 (2553) Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Shelby Thames, PH.D. - Part1, #31 (2553) Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Shelby Thames, PH.D. - Part2, #32 (2553) Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Shelby Thames, PH.D. - Part3, #33 (2553) Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Shelby Thames, PH.D. - Part4, #34 (2553) Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Shelby Thames, PH.D. - Part5, #35 (2621) Reply in support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Shelby Thames, #36 (2839) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames - Part1, #37 (2839) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames - Part2, #38 (2839) MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames - Part3, #39 (2841) Memo in support of MOTION by All Plaintiffs to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames, #40 (2957) RESPONSE by Ethicon in Opposition to Plaintiffs_ Motion to Exclude or Limit the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Shelby Thames, #41 (3037) REPLY by ALL Plaintiffs in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Shelby Thames, #42 (4852) Notice of adoption of prior daubert mte Dr. Shelby Thames, #43 (4941) Notice of adoption of prior daubert response of Dr. Shelby Thames, #44 (5018) Notice of adoption of prior daubert reply of Dr. Shelby Thames, #45 (2060) Plaintiffs' motion to exclude Tim Ulatowski WAVE 1, #46 (2065) Plaintiff's Memo in Support of Their Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinions of FDA Expert Timothy Ulatowski for Wave 8, #47 (2134) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #48 (2232) Plaintiffs_ Reply Brief in Support of Their Daubert Motion to Exclude FDA Expert Timothy Ulatowski, #49 (2910) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE AND NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF PRIOR DAUBERT RESPONSE REGARDING TIMOTHY ULATOWSKI FOR WAVE 3, #50 (4860) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Timothy Ulatowski)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 10/30/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/29/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/16/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (sak) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D.) re: ECF No. 4875 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. filed in MDL 2327; the ECF No. 2668 Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D.) entered on 8/26/2016 as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 6 cases identified in Exhibit A. The Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/5/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 6 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Peggy Pence, Ph. D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Peggy Pence, Ph. D.) filed at ECF No. 2664 in MDL 2327 on 8/25/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 6 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/1/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 6 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Michael Margolis, M.D.) directing the Clerk to STRIKE the NOTICE of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motions and Reply Briefings of Michael Thomas Margolis, M.D. for Wave 6 by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson filed at ECF No. 4858 in MDL 2327; further directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Thomas Margolis, M.D.) entered at ECF No. 2681 in MDL 2327on 8/30/2016 as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 6 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/31/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 6 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Prof. Dr. Med. Uwe Klinge) entered at ECF No. 2642 in MDL 2327 on 8/24/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 6 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/31/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 6 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (pma) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ADOPTING MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (Daubert ruling re: Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D.) directing that the Memorandum Opinion and Order (Daubert Motion re: Vladimir Iakovlev, M.D.) entered at ECF No. 2710 in MDL 2327 on 9/1/2016, as to the Ethicon Wave 1 cases is ADOPTED in the Wave 6 cases identified in Exhibit A; the Prior Order is attached hereto as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/27/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 6 cases identified in the Exhibit attached hereto) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 49 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #47 Opposition. (Kabbash, Maha) (Modified on 11/14/2017 to correct link and to convert event to reply to response) (lca). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster in support of #47 Opposition. (Jimenez, Priscilla) (Modified on 11/7/2017 to correct link and to convert event to memorandum in support) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 47 OPPOSITION by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster to #44 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Richard P. Marvel, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Priscilla) (Modified on 11/7/2017 to remove link to #45 memorandum) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 30, 2017 Filing 46 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster (Kabbash, Maha) (Modified on 10/30/2017 to add party filers) (mek). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #44 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Richard P. Marvel, M.D. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Richard P. Marvel, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E)(Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #42 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D)(Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 41 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Conduct an Indpendant Medical Examination of Plaintiff After Discovery is Closed and to Extend the Daubert Deadline (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 MOTION by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster to Conduct Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff Christine Lancaster After Discovery is Closed; the IME shall be completed by 10/25/2017; this order does not affect any other deadlines as stated in the Docket Control Order for Wave 6. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/12/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
September 27, 2017 Filing 39 AMENDED RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #37 MOTION by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster to Conduct Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff Christine Lancaster After Discovery is Closed (Kabbash, Maha) (Modified on 9/27/2017 to remove link to #28 memorandum) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 38 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #37 MOTION by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster for Leave to File Motion to Conduct Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff after Discovery is Closed (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster to Conduct Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff Christine Lancaster After Discovery is Closed (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Brian Murray, M.D. on September 21, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster of Brian P. Murray, MD on 9/19/2017 at 5:00 pm (Jimenez, Priscilla) (Modified on 9/14/2017 to convert event to notice to take or amend deposition) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PRETRIAL ORDER #270 (ORDER RE: STIPULATIONS EXTENDING DISCOVERY) After a cursory review of many individual cases in the Ethicon MDL, the court notes that the parties have attempted to stipulate a change in the court's Docket Control Orders setting deadlines for discovery. The parties cannot extend court ordered discovery deadlines past the date set for completion of discovery without approval from the court. Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 29(b); see Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 16(b)(4). Here, the parties are repeatedly attempting to stipulate to delay the completion of discovery, which affects other deadlines in the Docket Control Orders, such as the deadline for filing dispositive motions and the deadline for filing Daubert motions. Under Local Rule 16.1(f)(3), the court is not required to, nor does it, recognize stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines past the close of discovery. See LR Civ. P. 16.1(f)(3). Therefore, all such stipulations filed in the Ethicon MDL which are inconsistent with Local Rule 16.1(f)(3) are INEFFECTUAL and VOID. Such stipulations undermine the policy goals of the MDL, including convenience of the parties, efficiency of the pretrial proceedings, and consistency on related issues. The parties are DIRECTED to cease filing such stipulations purporting to extend the discovery deadlines contrary to Local Rule 16.1(f)(3). When the parties seek an extension of discovery deadlines past the date set for the completion of discovery in the Docket Control Order, they must do so by motion in the individual case. The Docket Control Orders are plain that the only discovery permitted after the close of discovery are depositions of the plaintiff's friends and family members, and only if such depositions are requested before the discovery deadline. Those orders remain unaffected. Modifications of the discovery schedule may be considered, for good cause shown. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4); see, e.g., PTO #251 at A.2.f. Good cause does not include mere agreement of the parties. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/13/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL Panel; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7 Cases) (drs) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
September 1, 2017 Filing 33 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Hee Joo Cheon on 9/13/2017 at 11:00 am (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster of Hee Joo Cheon, MD on 9/13/2017 at 11:00 a.m. (Jimenez, Priscilla) (Modified on 8/28/2017 to convert event to notice to take or amend deposition) (ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and Requests for Admission. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
July 27, 2017 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
July 24, 2017 Filing 28 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATIONS OF PLAINTIFF CHRISTINE A. LANCASTER by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Christina A. Lancaster (Kabbash, Maha) (Modified on 7/25/2017 to add party filer) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 27 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF PARTIES REGARDING THE DEPOSITION OF CONSORTIUM PLAINTIFF GEORGE E. LANCASTER by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster (Kabbash, Maha) (Modified on 7/12/2017 to add party filers)(skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
June 23, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Christine A. Lancaster on 7/14/2017 at 12:00 PM (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL ORDER # 261 (Re: Order Dismissing Ethicon, LLC in Cases Listed on Exhibit A) directing Ethicon, LLC be dismissed without prejudice from each case remaining in Wave 6, identified on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/23/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 6 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 24 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster. (Jimenez, Priscilla) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 23 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster. (Jimenez, Priscilla) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
May 4, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Diana Katz Gerstel on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Gerstel, Diana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
May 4, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Maha M. Kabbash on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Kabbash, Maha) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
May 4, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kelly S. Crawford on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Crawford, Kelly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Brian Murphy on 6/27/17 at 9:00 a.m. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Hee Joo Cheon on 6/27/17 at 9:00 a.m. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL ORDER # 251 (Docket Control Order - Wave 6 Cases) The parties recently submitted a joint list of 400 of the oldest cases in the Ethicon MDL not already in a wave that name only Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and/or Johnson & Johnson or allege claims against only the Ethicon defendants' products. These cases, attached hereto as Exhibit A, will be known as the "Ethicon Wave 6 cases," and it is ORDERED as follows: Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in the Ethicon Wave 6 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 5/25/2017, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 6/26/2017, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 8/11/2017, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 7/27/2017, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 8/28/2017, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 9/11/2017, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/25/2017, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/16/2017, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2017, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/06/2017, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/23/2017, Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/06/2017, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/13/2017. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: A consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/21/2017, any response is due 9/05/2017 and any reply is due 9/12/2017. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/30/2017, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties shall submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/11/2017. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/27/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2327; Wave 6 cases listed on Exhibit A) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
April 21, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
April 21, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above-named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
June 26, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
June 24, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
June 4, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
May 30, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
April 1, 2013 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Ethicon, LLC re: #1 Complaint. Ethicon, LLC served on 2/13/2013, answer due 3/6/2013. Summons served on Scott LaScala, Process Agent. (Balefsky, Lee) Modified on 4/2/2013 to add text for clarity (arb). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
March 25, 2013 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Ethicon, LLC. Ethicon, LLC served on 2/13/2013, answer due 3/6/2013. Summons served on scott lascala. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
February 18, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, LLC. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
February 11, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
February 4, 2013 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, re: #4 Amended Short Form Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (skh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
February 1, 2013 Filing 4 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Christina A. Lancaster, George E. Lancaster against Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Tiger, Michelle) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
January 24, 2013 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 37 (Revised Verifications and Authorizations attached to Plaintiff Profile Form) entered on 01/24/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Verifications and Authorizations) (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
January 24, 2013 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]
January 23, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2188462. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancaster et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC.
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc.
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina A. Lancaster
Represented By: John K. Powers
Represented By: Lee Balefsky
Represented By: Laura M. Jordan
Represented By: Priscilla Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George E. Lancaster
Represented By: John K. Powers
Represented By: Lee Balefsky
Represented By: Laura M. Jordan
Represented By: Priscilla Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?