CompassCare et al v. Cuomo et al
Plaintiff: First Bible Baptist Church, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates and CompassCare
Defendant: Roberta Reardon, Letitia James and Andrew M. Cuomo
Case Number: 1:2019cv01409
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 TEXT NOTICE: Plaintiff's #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is on Judge McAvoy's 3/9/20 Motion Calendar. Defendant's Response to Motion is due by 1/20/2020. Plaintiff's Reply to Response to Motion is due by 2/14/2020. (sfp, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2020 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy Response to Motion due by 2/21/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/27/2020. filed by CompassCare, First Bible Baptist Church, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit of James R. Harden, #3 Exhibit(s) A: Excerpted Employee and Volunteer Manual, #4 Exhibit(s) B: General Orientation Checklist, #5 Exhibit(s) C. Performance Review, #6 Exhibit(s) D. Patient Flow Process, #7 Affidavit of Thomas Glessner, #8 Affidavit of Kevin Pestke) (Connelly, Kenneth)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Stipulation for a briefing schedule. Pltf's will file their motion for preliminary injunction by 12/20/19. Defts will file their response by 1/20/20. Pltfs will file their reply to response to motion by 2/14/20. Defts shall file their reply to Pltf's opposition by 2/28/20. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 12/11/19. (sfp, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Requesting Order for Briefing Schedule by CompassCare, First Bible Baptist Church, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates submitted to Judge Thomas J. McAvoy. (Connelly, Kenneth)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne J. Kerwin on behalf of Andrew M. Cuomo, Letitia James, Roberta Reardon (Kerwin, Adrienne)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Theriot on behalf of CompassCare, First Bible Baptist Church, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (Theriot, Kevin)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Connelly on behalf of CompassCare, First Bible Baptist Church, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates (Connelly, Kenneth)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Bible Baptist Church, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, CompassCare. Letitia James served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Cortman, David)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Bible Baptist Church, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, CompassCare. Roberta Reardon served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Cortman, David)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Bible Baptist Church, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, CompassCare. Andrew M. Cuomo served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Cortman, David)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kevin H. Theriot is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Plaintiffs. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/20/2019. (mab)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kenneth J. Connelly is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Plaintiffs. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/20/2019. (mab)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Theriot Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4948722. filed by CompassCare, First Bible Baptist Church, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Exhibit(s) ECF Registration, #3 Exhibit(s) Petition for Admission to Practice, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificates of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order Granting Petition for Admission to Practice) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Cortman, David)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth Connelly Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4948688. filed by CompassCare, First Bible Baptist Church, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Exhibit(s) ECF Registration, #3 Exhibit(s) Petition for Admission to Practice, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificates of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order Granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Cortman, David)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party CompassCare; National Institute of Family and Life Adovcates and Baptist Church; Attorney Kevin Theriot and Kenneth J. Connelly, Email address is ktheriot@ADFlegal.org; kconnelly@ADFlegal.org. Phone number is (480) 444-0020. Admissions due by 11/29/2019. {Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail}(mgh)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/20/2020 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/13/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Letitia James, #2 Summons Issued as to Roberta Reardon)(mgh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Cuomo, Lettia James, Roberta Reardon (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4943752) filed by First Bible Baptist Church, National Institute of Family and Life Advocates, CompassCare. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CompassCare et al v. Cuomo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Reardon
Represented By: Adrienne J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letitia James
Represented By: Adrienne J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Cuomo
Represented By: Adrienne J. Kerwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Bible Baptist Church
Represented By: David A. Cortman
Represented By: James P. Trainor
Represented By: Kevin Theriot
Represented By: Kenneth Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Institute of Family and Life Advocates
Represented By: David A. Cortman
Represented By: James P. Trainor
Represented By: Kevin Theriot
Represented By: Kenneth Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CompassCare
Represented By: David A. Cortman
Represented By: James P. Trainor
Represented By: Kevin Theriot
Represented By: Kenneth Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?