Witherspoon v. New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Plaintiff: Doretha A. Witherspoon
Defendant: New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Case Number: 1:2019cv01440
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Marie Knapp on behalf of New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision (Knapp, Lynn)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mark Richter - Associate Counsel for Defendant on December 10, 2019, filed by Doretha A. Witherspoon. (Brownell, Conor)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's #5 Letter Request for extension. New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision answer due 1/31/2020. The Rule 16 Conference set for 2/18/2020 remains as scheduled. Plaintiff is directed to file affidavit of service by 1/3/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 12/26/2019. (sg )
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 First Letter Motion from Melissa A. Latino for New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision requesting extension of time to answer complaint submitted to Judge Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino . (Latino, Melissa)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (see)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/11/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision. (jmb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: against New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4942805) filed by Doretha A. Witherspoon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witherspoon v. New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Represented By: Melissa A. Latino
Represented By: Lynn Marie Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doretha A. Witherspoon
Represented By: Conor E. Brownell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?