Quick Shop Deli Grocery et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Nabil Al Zandani and Quick Shop Deli Grocery
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01443
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 2011
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION & ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on January 06, 2020. (sas)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT by United States of America submitted to Judge Hon. Lawrence E. Kahn. (Stack, Emer)
December 30, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference held on 12/30/2019. Appearances by Jeremy Feigenbaum, Esq. for plaintiff, AUSA Emer Stack for the United States. Plaintiff is permitted to file a Motion to Stay and indicates he will do so by 1/6/2020. Defendant advises the court that their position will be not to oppose, but they cannot stipulate. A response to the Motion will be filed by Defendants by 1/8/2020. The Court will expedite the handling of this motion in light of Defendant's anticipated response. (tab)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Letter Request from Plaintiffs for Quick Shop Deli Grocery, Nabil Al Zandani requesting Pre Motion Conference. A TELEPHONIC, Pre-Motion Filing Conference is set for 12/30/2019 @ 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Counsel are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/23/2019. (tab)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Emer Stack on behalf of United States of America (Stack, Emer)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 First Letter Motion from Plaintiffs for Quick Shop Deli Grocery, Nabil Al Zandani requesting Pre Motion Conf submitted to Judge Hummel, USMJ . (Feigenbaum, Jeremy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/12/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sfp, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4951124) filed by Quick Shop Deli Grocery, Nabil Al Zandani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quick Shop Deli Grocery et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nabil Al Zandani
Represented By: Todd Andrew Spodek
Represented By: Jeremy G Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quick Shop Deli Grocery
Represented By: Todd Andrew Spodek
Represented By: Jeremy G Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Emer Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?