Gould v. Marconi Development Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Linda Gould
Defendant: Marconi Development Group, LLC, Yacine Nouri and Reda Tadjer
Case Number: 1:2019cv01454
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Hoke on behalf of Linda Gould (Hoke, John)
January 17, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Yacine Nouri answer due 1/3/2020. (see)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and General Order Number 25 served on Yacine Nouri on 12/31/19, filed by Linda Gould. (Hoke, John)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (see)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/13/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Marconi Development Group, LLC, Yacine Nouri, and Reda Tadjer. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Yacine Nouri, #2 Summons for Reda Tadjer)(see)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Marconi Development Group, LLC, Yacine Nouri, and Reda Tadjer (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4953272) filed by Linda Gould. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould v. Marconi Development Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marconi Development Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yacine Nouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reda Tadjer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Gould
Represented By: Meredith A. Moriarty
Represented By: John J. Hoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?