Hogan et al v. CVS Albany, LLC
Plaintiff: Regina Hogan and Richard W. Hogan, Jr.
Defendant: CVS Albany, LLC
Not Yet Classified: James E. Hacker
Case Number: 1:2019cv01455
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that James E. Hacker has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: William D. Yoquinto and Sanford Rosenblum. Dated: 1/15/20(Wisniewski, Gina)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MANDATORY MEDIATION PROGRAM: This case is referred to participation in the Mandatory Mediation Program. The parties should refer to General Order #47. The deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 5/29/2020. The deadline for the parties file a Stipulation selecting a Mediator is 1/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/2/2020. (mab)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 4-5 Days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 2/14/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/14/2020. Plaintiffs to serve expert disclosures by 4/13/2020. Defendant to serve expert disclosure by 5/26/2020. Rebuttals to be served by 6/10/2020. Discovery due by 7/10/2020. Motions to be filed by 9/11/2020. The Court has discussed Mandatory Mediation and will issue a separate Order referring this action into the Mandatory Mediation Program. The deadline to complete Mandatory Mediation is 5/29/2020. Status Report due by 3/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/2/2020. (mab)
December 20, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Rule 16 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/20/2019. Appearances: William Yoquinto, Esq. for Defendant. Plaintiffs' counsel did not appear. Mandatory Disclosures have been exchanged. The Court addresses Mandatory Mediation. Scheduling Order deadlines set. A Uniform Pretrial Order will be issued. (TIME: 11:42AM-11:48AM). (mab)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by CVS Albany, LLC. (Yoquinto, William)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter is RESCHEDULED for December 20, 2019 at 11:30 AM before the undersigned. Counsel are directed to appear IN PERSON at the James T. Foley US Courthouse, 445 Broadway, 4th Floor, Room 409, Albany, NY on the scheduled date and time. Counsel are also directed to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures on or before December 13, 2019. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/6/2019. (mab)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CVS Albany, LLC re #8 Answer to Complaint, #9 Jury Demand (Yoquinto, William)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CVS Albany, LLC. (Yoquinto, William)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by CVS Albany, LLC.(Yoquinto, William)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CVS Albany, LLC re #2 State Court Complaint, #3 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal (Yoquinto, William)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CVS Albany, LLC re #5 Notice of Appearance (Wisniewski, Gina)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina T. Wisniewski on behalf of CVS Albany, LLC (Wisniewski, Gina)
November 25, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for CVS Albany, LLC answer due 11/29/2019. (khr)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/23/2019 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/16/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS Albany, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Melanie K. Luker)(khr)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by CVS Albany, LLC. (khr)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Albany, case number 907079-19 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4953560) filed by CVS Albany, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan et al v. CVS Albany, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Hogan
Represented By: Sanford Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. Hogan, Jr.
Represented By: Sanford Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Albany, LLC
Represented By: William D. Yoquinto
Represented By: Gina T. Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: James E. Hacker
Represented By: James E. Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?