Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Barker
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Kathleen Burke Barker
Case Number: 1:2019cv01456
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kathleen Burke Barker.(Casey, Brian)
December 10, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Kathleen Burke Barker answer due 12/26/2019.
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint,Notice Order served on Kathleen Burke Barker on 12/04/2019, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Grogan, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Grogan, Elizabeth)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/27/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kathleen Burke Barker. (pjh)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Kathleen Burke Barker (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4953636) filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Burke Barker
Represented By: Brian D. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Grogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?