Planck v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jason S. Planck
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01463
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 DECISION and ORDER granting Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying without prejudice as premature Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and denying without prejudice as premature Plaintiff's #6 Letter Request for a conference. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/27/2019. (Copy served upon Plaintiff via regular mail)(amt)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Saul re 9 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Commissioner (Tucker, Jessica)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jessica Tucker appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 2/24/2020. (Tucker, Jessica)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE HANDBOOK, LOCAL RULES and NOTICE issued and explained to Jason S. Planck at time complaint was filed (sfp, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. (sfp, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Motion filed by Jason S. Planck requesting conference submitted to Judge Baxter. (sfp, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jason S. Planck. (sfp, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Jason S. Planck advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (sfp, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jason S. Planck. (sfp, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (sfp, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planck v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Jessica Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason S. Planck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?