Murray et al v. Wheeler et al
Plaintiff: June Omura and William Murray
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers and R.D. James
Case Number: 1:2019cv01498
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 33:1251
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 TEXT NOTICE of Rescheduling of the Rule 16 Initial Conference: The Telephone Rule 16 Initial Conference has been RESCHEDULED for 3/26/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call as directed in General Order 25. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed NO LATER THAN 3/19/2020 and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/19/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sg )
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER : Court has reviewed Plaintiff's #4 Letter Request to reschedule the Rule 16 Conference, and Defendants' #7 Letter Request for extension of time to respond to the complaint and reschedule the Rule 16 Conference, which are granted for the reasons stated therein. All Defendants' answer due 3/16/2020. The Rule 16 Conference and associated deadlines will be reset by separate text notice. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/29/2020. (sg )
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 Consent Letter Motion from Erica Zilioli for R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and for Adjournment of Initial Telephone Conference submitted to Judge Dancks . (Zilioli, Erica)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Zilioli on behalf of R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler (Zilioli, Erica)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) and Local Rule 4.1(C) served on Andrew Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency, R.D. James, U.S. Department of the Army, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney's Office/Syracuse, NY on December 12, 2019, filed by William Murray. (Bacon, James)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Letter Motion from James Bacon for William Murray requesting 1 week adjournment submitted to Judge Dancks . (Bacon, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/26/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, #2 Summons Issued as to R.D. James, #3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, #4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office, #5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General)(pjh)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4962323) filed by William Murray and June Omura. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray et al v. Wheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Erica Zilioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: Erica Zilioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Erica Zilioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.D. James
Represented By: Erica Zilioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Omura
Represented By: James Bryan Bacon, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Murray
Represented By: James Bryan Bacon, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?