Scism v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Judith Scism
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01543
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
2 Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Response to Motion due by 1/24/2020, Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/30/2020. Hearing set for 2/10/2020 in Utica before Judge David N. Hurd on SUBMITTED PAPERS ONLY with no appearances required or allowed. (rjm)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of the Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. #10 ), the 3/12/2020 Rule 16 Conference and the associated deadlines are adjourned at this time without new date. The Conference will be rescheduled, if necessary, once the motion to dismiss has been decided by the District Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/31/2020. (sg )
January 30, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(Crawford, Kelly)
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Judith Scism. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(Lizik, Dana)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David N. Hurd for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 1/9/20. (amt)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Crawford, Kelly)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2020 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy Response to Motion due by 1/24/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/30/2020. filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Certification of Service, #3 Proposed Order/Judgment) (Crawford, Kelly)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Judith Scism. Ethicon, Inc. served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Lizik, Dana)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Judith Scism. Johnson & Johnson served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Lizik, Dana)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Lizik on behalf of Judith Scism (Lizik, Dana)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana Lizik, Esq. for Judith Scism. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 12/30/2019. (sg)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana Lizik Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4983790. filed by Judith Scism. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Petition of Dana Lizik for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Declaration Sponsor Declaration of Nicholas R. Farnolo, #4 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Exhibit(s) New Attorney ECF Registration Form) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Farnolo, Nicholas)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Dana Lizik, Email address is dlizik@johnsonlawgroup.com. Phone number is (713)626-9336. Admissions due by 12/27/2019. [Served by reg. mail.](sfp, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/5/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sfp, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4971715) filed by Judith Scism.(sfp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sfp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scism v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Scism
Represented By: Nicholas R. Farnolo
Represented By: Dana Lizik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?