State of New York v. The U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: State of New York
Defendant: The U.S. Department of the Interior and The U.S. Office of Management and Budget
Case Number: 1:2019cv01551
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: On February 5, 2020, Plaintiff filed proof of service of the Summons and Complaint upon Defendants in this matter. Dkt. No. #4 . The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is March 30, 2020. The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for March 17, 2020 before the undersigned and the deadline for the parties to file a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date and will be rescheduled upon the filing of Defendants' Answers. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/10/2020. (mab)
February 6, 2020 ***Answer due date set for The U.S. Department of the Interior answer due 3/30/2020 and The U.S. Office of Management and Budget answer due 3/30/2020. (kmp)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The U.S. Office of Management and Budget, The U.S. Department of the Interior, United States Attorney General, Civil Process Clerk for the U.S. Attorney's Office in the Northern District of New York on January 30, 2020, filed by State of New York. (McGrath, Brendan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/10/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to The U.S. Department of the Interior, The U.S. Office of Management and Budget. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for The U.S. Office of Management and Budget, #2 Summons Issued for United States Attorney General, #3 Summons Issued for United States Attorney)(hmr)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against The U.S. Department of the Interior, The U.S. Office of Management and Budget (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4974206) filed by State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A NYSOAG FOIA Request to DOI, #2 Exhibit B NYSOAG FOIA Request to OMB, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York v. The U.S. Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Michael J. Myers
Represented By: Brendan S. McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The U.S. Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The U.S. Office of Management and Budget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?