Lee v. Kodai America LLC et al
Plaintiff: Iulia Chin Lee
Defendant: Hideko Imamura, Dongming Tang and Kodai America LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01555
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action is dismissed and this case is remanded to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Ulster County, Index No. 19-3608. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. #9 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/29/2020. (Copy served on Plaintiff and the Supreme Court, Ulster County via regular mail)(rjb, )
January 29, 2020 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brenda K. Sannes: Telephone Conference held on 1/29/2020. Appearances: Iulia Chin Lee, Plaintiff pro se; Laura Wong-Pan, Esq. for Defendants. Plaintiff's attorney is not admitted in this district so Plaintiff is appearing pro se from her attorney's office with her attorney, Joseph Ingarra, present. Plaintiff withdraws her second cause of action and seeks to have the case remanded back to state court with no objections from Defendants. An order will be issued by the Court. (Court Reporter Jodi Hibbard; 2:32PM-2:37PM) (rjb, )
January 27, 2020 TEXT NOTICE OF HEARING CHANGE: Due to a conflict with Attorney Ingarra's schedule, the Telephone Conference set for 1/30/2020 is hereby rescheduled for 1/29/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Brenda K. Sannes. Defendants' counsel is directed to initiate the call and should contact chambers at (315) 234-8598 once all counsel are on the line. (Attorney Ingarra's office notified of the conference by telephone). (rjb, )
January 27, 2020 TEXT NOTICE OF HEARING: As Plaintiff's attorney was unavailable for the call on 1/27/2020, the Telephone Conference is hereby rescheduled for 1/30/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Brenda K. Sannes. Defendants' counsel is directed to initiate the call and should contact chambers at (315) 234-8598 once all counsel are on the line. (Attorney Ingarra's office notified of the conference by telephone).(rjb, ) Modified on 1/27/2020 (rjb, ).
January 22, 2020 Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Brenda K. Sannes. Defendants' counsel is directed to initiate the call and should contact chambers at (315) 234-8598 once all counsel are on the line. (rjb, )
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel, who is not admitted to practice in the Northern District of New York, submitted a letter to the Court enclosing his PACER account number and Affirmation in Opposition to the #1 Notice of Removal. Dkt. No. #16 . Plaintiff's counsel has been advised that his formal admission is required if he is going to appear as counsel in this action. Dkt. No. #3 . Therefore, Plaintiff's #16 submission is hereby stricken from the record and will not be considered by the Court. SO ORDERED by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/15/2020. (Copy served Attorney Ingarra via regular mail)(rjb, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 16 ***STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY DKT. NO. 17*** Cover Letter from Joseph Ingarra, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation in Opposition)(khr) Modified on 1/15/2020 (rjb, ).
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is hereby scheduled for January 27, 2020 at 11:00 AM to discuss Defendants' #9 Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's #13 Letter. The Court notes that that admissions deadline set by the Clerk's Office for Plaintiff's attorney expired on December 31, 2019. Dkt. No. #3 . Plaintiff is advised that an attorney admitted to the Northern District of New York must file a notice of appearance and appear for the conference on January 27, 2020. Defendants' counsel is directed to initiate the call and should contact chambers at (315) 234-8598 once all counsel are on the line (text order served on Attorney Ingarra via regular mail). SO ORDERED by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/15/2020. (rjb, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hideko Imamura, Kodai America LLC, Dongming Tang re #10 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Wong-Pan, Laura)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Joseph Michael Ingarra, Esq, attorney for plaintiffs inquiring why this is a Federal Case. Case was removed from State Court (khr)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the dispositive motion (tab)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT re #10 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Declaration of Service of Notice of Motion and Supporting Documents by Hideko Imamura, Kodai America LLC, Dongming Tang. (Wong-Pan, Laura)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim CORRECTED DECLARATION filed by Hideko Imamura, Kodai America LLC, Dongming Tang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint)(Wong-Pan, Laura)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2019 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Judge Brenda K. Sannes Response to Motion due by 1/22/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/28/2019. filed by Hideko Imamura, Kodai America LLC, Dongming Tang. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint) (Wong-Pan, Laura)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Hideko Imamura, Kodai America LLC, Dongming Tang. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Wong-Pan, Laura)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Hideko Imamura, Kodai America LLC, Dongming Tang. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Wong-Pan, Laura)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal and supporting documents, and Filing Order served on Plaintiff on 12/17/2019, filed by Hideko Imamura, Kodai America LLC, Dongming Tang. (Wong-Pan, Laura)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kodai America LLC. (Wong-Pan, Laura)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/17/2020 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/10/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Joseph M. Ingarra,145 Wall Street, PO Box 3190, Kingston, NY 12402. Phone number is 845-331-7377. Admissions due by 12/31/2019. (khr)(Mailed copy of letter on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Hideko Imamura, Kodai America LLC, Dongming Tang. (khr)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Ulster, case number 19-3608 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALB04974977) filed by Kodai America LLC, Hideko Imamura, Dongming Tang. (Attachments: #1 Defendnat's Notice of Consent to Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)
December 17, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Hideko Imamura answer due 12/24/2019; Kodai America LLC answer due 12/24/2019; Dongming Tang answer due 12/24/2019. (khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Kodai America LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hideko Imamura
Represented By: Laura M. Wong-Pan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongming Tang
Represented By: Laura M. Wong-Pan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kodai America LLC
Represented By: Laura M. Wong-Pan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iulia Chin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?