Davis v. Equifax, Inc.
Plaintiff: Garrison Davis
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00018
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER setting the Amended Pleadings deadline for 3/12/2020. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 2/27/2020. (Copy served via regular mail on 2/28/2020)(tab)
February 27, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Status Conference held on 2/27/2020. Appearances by pro se plaintiff Garrison Davis and Robert Warren Gray, Jr., Esq. for Defendant. The Court explains to plaintiff what Defendant's motion for a more definite statement means and what is expected. Defendants agree to accept service of an amended complaint and will accept service by mail. The Court confirms that defendants will have the standard 21 days to answer or respond to the complaint once it is filed. Plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint by 3/12/2020. (Court Reporter Theresa Casal) (tab)
February 18, 2020 Filing 19 COURT NOTICE of Tele-Conference: A Telephonic Status Conference has been set for Thursday, 2/27/2020 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Plaintiff Davis and Defense counsel are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call. (tab) (Notice mailed to plaintiff on 2/18/2020 via regular mail)
February 18, 2020 Filing 18 COURT NOTICE of Return Date on #15 MOTION for More Definite Statement : Response to Motion due by 3/2/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/9/2020. Motion will be considered fully briefed on 3/19/2020 and will be before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. This motion will be taken on submit unless otherwise directed. [No personal appearance on 3/19/2020](tab) (Notice mailed to plaintiff on 2/18/2020 via regular mail.)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Letter Request to Withdraw as Attorney Emily Chen as counsel for Equifax, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 2/14/2020. (Copy served via regular mail)(tab)
February 12, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Emily Chen as counsel for Equifax, Inc. filed by Equifax, Inc.. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Chen, Emily)
February 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for More Definite Statement Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2020 09:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe Response to Motion due by 3/2/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/9/2020. filed by Equifax, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Robert Gray in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Gray, Robert)
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE (TEXT-ONLY) from the Clerk of the MDL Panel. The Clerk of the Panel has determined that this action is not appropriate for inclusion into MDL-2800 Equifax Inc. Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols 2/6/2020. (plp)
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Warren Gray, Jr on behalf of Equifax, Inc. (Gray, Robert)
February 3, 2020 Filing 12 COURT NOTICE re #5 G.O. 25 Filing Order. The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 2/10/2020 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending the lifting of the STAY in this case. (tab)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion: All proceedings and deadlines in this case are stayed until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether this case will be transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Georgia as a tag-along action for coordination or consolidation in the pending MDL proceeding, In re Equifax, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2800. Defense counsel is directed to file a status report in this case on 3/1/2020 if a transfer to MDL has not yet transpired by then. So Ordered. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/16/2020. (Copy served via regular mail on 1/16/2020)(tab)
January 15, 2020 Filing 10 Letter Motion from Emily T. Chen for Equifax, Inc. requesting stay of the action pending determination by JPMDL as to whether to transfer this action to the Northern District of Georgia for inclusion in the pending MDL proceeding relating to the data security Equifax incident. In re Equifax, Inc., Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2800 submitted to Judge Gary L. Sharpe . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action, #2 Exhibit 2 - JPML Transfer Order,, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order)(Chen, Emily)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 COURT NOTICE of Conference: A Telephone Conference has been set for Tuesday, 1/21/2020 @ 11:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Plaintiff Davis and defense counsel are directed to dial into our chamber's conference line @ 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call.(tab)(Notice mailed to plaintiff via regular mail on 1/10/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NONE for Equifax, Inc... (Chen, Emily)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Equifax, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal including Civil Cover Sheet (Chen, Emily)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 PRO SE HANDBOOK, NOTICE and Copy of Local Rules served upon Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail. (pjh) Modified on 1/8/2020 to clarify that the Local Rules were also served. (pjh)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/3/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.){Clerk notes that the G.O. 25 was amended only to reflect that the case will proceed on a conventional track rather than an ADR track} Copy of Amended G.O. 25 served upon Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail. (pjh)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant's Counsel; Attorney Robert Gray. Phone number is 212-556-2100. Admissions due by 1/21/2020. (pjh)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/3/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Garrison Davis in the Cohoes City Court Small Claims Part (Case number SC-000676-19/CO) filed by Equifax, Inc. (pjh)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cohoes City Court Small Claims Part, case number SC-000676-19/CO (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4990751) filed by Equifax, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Equifax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrison Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Emily T. Chen
Represented By: Robert Warren Gray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?