Gencarelli v. The Coca-Cola Company et al
Plaintiff: James Gencarelli
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company and Liberty Coca-Cola Beverages
Case Number: 1:2020cv00085
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 Letter dated March 6, 2020 from James Gencarelli advising the Court he will be out of the area from March 9th until March 19th. (khr)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued on 1/24/2020. (khr)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 Pro Se MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password filed by James Gencarelli. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se CM/ECF Registration Form) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (khr)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Gencarelli. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Coca-Cola Company, #2 Proposed Summons as to Liberty Coca-Cola Beverages) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (khr)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Liberty Coca-Cola Beverages, The Coca-Cola Company filed by James Gencarelli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gencarelli v. The Coca-Cola Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Coca-Cola Beverages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gencarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?