J.B. v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Plaintiff: J.B.
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America and Vincent Siecinski
Case Number: 1:2020cv00180
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 Court has reviewed docket. The 5/6/2020 telephone Rule 16 Initial Conference and associated deadlines are adjourned at this time without new date. Defendant counsel to file status report on the Bankruptcy by 5/26/2020. SO ORDERED Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/9/2020. (sg )
March 31, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE by Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America NOTICE OF ENTRY OF CONSENT ORDER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a) AND 362 GRANTING THE BSAS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION with attached Exhibit to indicate this is an amended notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Consent Order)(Beckwith, Mathew) Modified on 3/31/2020 (sal ).
March 31, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America NOTICE OF ENTRY OF CONSENT ORDER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a) AND 362 GRANTING THE BSAS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Beckwith, Mathew)
March 11, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: The Clerk has replaced the pdf image attached to the #11 Notice of Appearance docket entry filed by Patrick Sorsby on behalf of plaintiff, since the initial attachment was an incorrect pdf image. The NEF was regenerated to all counsel of record for service. (jmb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Sorsby on behalf of J.B. (Sorsby, Patrick) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/11/2020) (jmb, ).
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Guetti on behalf of Vincent Siecinski (Guetti, Christopher)
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America NOTICE OF (I) COMMENCEMENT OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND FILING OF MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY THE BSA, (II) MEETING TO CONSIDER THE FORMATION OF AN OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF CREDITORS AND (III) FILING OF MOTION BY THE BSA DEBTORS TO FIX VENUE FOR CLAIMS RELATED TO THE BANKRUPTCY UNDER 28 U.S.C. 157(b)(5) AND 1334(b) (Beckwith, Mathew)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew William Beckwith on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America (Beckwith, Mathew)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER directing Defendants to promptly redact Plaintiff's name, and replace that name with Plaintiff's initials, in the Notice of Removal and documents attached thereto (Dkt. No. #1 ), and Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. No. #2 ), pursuant to General Order #22, and to email those redacted documents directly to the undersigned's Courtroom Deputy at shelly_muller@nynd.uscourts.gov. Moreover, the Clerk of the Court is directed to replace Plaintiff's name on the docket sheet with Plaintiff's initials, and to restrict public access to the Notice of Removal and documents attached thereto (Dkt. No. #1 ), and Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. No. #2 ), so that those documents may be viewed only by case participants, until such time as those documents have been replaced on the docket with redacted copies. Once the above-described documents have been replaced on the docket with redacted copies, the Clerk may unrestrict access to those documents. Finally, Defendant is directed to redact Plaintiff's name, and replace that name with Plaintiff's initials, in all documents hereafter filed by Defendants in this Court through CM/ECF. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/21/2020. (sal)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party for BSA Defendants'; Attorney Michael J. Mazurczak, Esq., Email address is maz@melicklaw.com. Attorney Mathew W. Beckwith, Esq., Email address is mbeckwith@melicklaw.com. Phone number is 212-541-7236. Admissions due by 3/5/2020. {Copy of Letter sent to attorneys by regular mail} (jmb)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/29/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by the Boy Scouts of America and Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America. (jmb) (Main Document replaced to redact plaintiff's name) (sal ).
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), and CROSSCLAIM against the Boy Scouts of America and Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America, filed by defendant Vincent Siecinski. (jmb) (Main Document replaced to redact plaintiff's name) (sal, ).
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT: relating to the #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Boy Scouts of America and Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America. (jmb)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: from NYS Supreme Court, County of Schenectady, case number 905313-19 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5033283) filed by Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Case File, #2 Exhibit A1 - State Court Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit A2 - Stipulation, #4 Exhibit A3 - Siecinski Answer and Crossclaim, #5 Exhibit A4 - BSA and TRC of BSA Answer, #6 Exhibit A5 - Request for Judicial Intervention, #7 Exhibit A6 - Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit A7 - Discovery Stipulation, #9 Certificate of Service, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.B. v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Donna L. Burden
Represented By: Mathew William Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Donna L. Burden
Represented By: Mathew William Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Siecinski
Represented By: Christopher A. Guetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.B.
Represented By: Patrick Sorsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?