Doe v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America and Glens Falls City School District
Case Number: 1:2020cv00211
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed docket. The 5/4/2020 telephone Rule 16 Initial Conference and associated deadlines are adjourned at this time without new date. Defendant counsel to file status report on the Bankruptcy by 5/26/2020. SO ORDERED Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/9/2020. (sg )
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Letter Request. As previously stated by the court, based upon the #14 Notice filed in this action, the briefing schedule regarding the #12 Motion to Remand to State Court is stayed through and including May 18, 2020, subject to extension by the Bankruptcy Court. Defendant Glens Falls City School District will then have an opportunity to join in this motion and a new briefing schedule will thereafter be set by the Court. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 4/8/2020. (sal )
April 7, 2020 Filing 16 Letter Motion from John D. Wright, Esq. for Glens Falls City School District requesting reservation of rights submitted to Judge Suddaby . (Wright, John)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER : Based upon the #14 Notice filed in this action, the briefing schedule regarding the #12 Motion to Remand to State Court is stayed through and including May 18, 2020, subject to extension by the Bankruptcy Court. A new briefing schedule will thereafter be set by the Court. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 4/3/2020. (sal)
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America of Entry of Consent Order and Granting the BSA's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent Order)(Kenny, Mike)
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mike Kenny on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America (Kenny, Mike)
March 30, 2020 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on #12 Motion to Remand to State Court New York Supreme Court: Response to Motion is due by 4/16/2020. Any reply to this motion is due by 4/23/2020. This motion is taken on submission of the papers and returnable on 4/30/2020 before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. No appearances are required. (sal)
March 28, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION to Remand to State Court New York Supreme Court Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2020 09:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks Response to Motion due by 4/13/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/20/2020. filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Jordan Merson, #3 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit(s) Order - 20-945 (WFK), #6 Exhibit(s) Order - 20-880 (WFK), #7 Affidavit Affidavit of Service) (Cantos, Sarah)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #10 Plaintiff's letter-motion as non-compliant with Local Rule 7.1(a) of the District's Local Rules of Practice. Plaintiff is respectfully advised that, should the motion be renewed in its proper form, then a briefing schedule shall be set with a return date before the undersigned, and it will be decided based on the papers, unless the Court finds a need for oral argument. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/26/2020. (sal )
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 First Letter Motion from Sarah R. Cantos for John Doe requesting Remand to State Court submitted to Judge Hon. Therese Wiley Danks March 25, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Removal dated February 25, 2020, #2 Exhibit(s) Order signed by Hon. William F. Kuntz, II dated March 10, 2020, #3 Exhibit(s) Order signed by Hon. William F. Kuntz, II dated February 28, 2020)(Cantos, Sarah)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed Defendant Twin Rivers Council, Inc.'s letter request (Dkt. No. #7 ) for extension of time to respond to the complaint which is granted. Said defendant's time to respond to the complaint is adjourned without new date at this time. However, said defendant shall file a status report by 4/3/2020 regarding the Delaware Bankruptcy Court proceeding. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/19/2020. (sg )
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Boy Scouts of America OF COMMENCEMENT OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND FILING OF MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Miller, Michael)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 First Letter Motion from Michael L. Kenny Jr. for Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America requesting Extension of Time to File Answer submitted to Judge Therese W. Dancks . (Miller, Michael)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America re #5 Notice of Admission Requirement, (Miller, Michael)
February 27, 2020 ***Answer due date set for Boy Scouts of America answer due 3/3/2020; Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America answer due 3/3/2020. (kmp)
February 26, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk notes that Attorney Michael Leonard Miller's address in CM/ECF is listed as One Century Tower, 265 Church St., New Haven, CT 06510. However, Clerk noted in the Complaint it is listed as 437 Madison Ave, 35th Floor, New York, NY 10022. Clerk also noted that Mr. Miller's telephone number on CM/ECF is listed as 203-498-4438. However, in the closing of the Complaint it is listed as 212-551-2600. If CM/ECF needs to be updated, the attorney is directed to do so. (kmp)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party BSA Defendants'; Attorney James I. Glasser; Kevin M. Smith; and Michael L. Kenny, Email address is jglasser@wiggin.com; ksmith@wiggin.com; and mkenny@wiggin.com;. Phone number is 212-551-2600. Admissions due by 3/11/2020. (Copy served upon attorneys via regular mail)(kmp)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Rule 16 Conference set for 5/4/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/27/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Boy Scouts of America. (kmp)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS relating to #1 Notice of Removal filed by Boy Scouts of America. (kmp)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren County Supreme Court, case number EF2020-67684 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5039750) filed by Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Case File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Michael Leonard Miller
Represented By: Mike Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Rivers Council, Inc., Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Mike Kenny
Represented By: Michael Leonard Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glens Falls City School District
Represented By: John D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Jordan Merson
Represented By: Sarah Rae Cantos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?