Boyd v. VSH Realty, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bethany A. Boyd
Defendant: VSH Realty, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00247
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 3 days (Jury Trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 6/5/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2020. Discovery due by 12/30/2020. Motions to be filed by 1/29/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 8/14/2020. Status Report due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/10/2020. (tab)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 5/8/2020. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 8/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/10/2020. (tab)
April 9, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/9/2020 by telephone. Appearances by Carolyn George, Esq. for plaintiff; Allison Leibowitz, Esq. for Defendant. Pretrial deadlines are established and a scheduling Order will be issued. Plaintiff indicates that she may need to amend the complaint. The Court advises that if defendants cannot stipulate to a proposed amended complaint, parties should notify the Court and a pre-motion conference can be scheduled. (tab)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO STRIKE re #12 Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) (filed as CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN) filed by Bethany A. Boyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/8/2020. (dpk)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO JUDGE HUMMEL'S ORDER entered 4/8/2020** CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bethany A. Boyd. (George, Carolyn) Modified on 4/8/2020 (dpk).
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by VSH Realty, Inc.. (Leibowitz, Allison)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Jury Demand served on Cooper, Erving & Savage, LLP on April 1, 2020, filed by VSH Realty, Inc.. (Leibowitz, Allison)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by VSH Realty, Inc.. (Leibowitz, Allison)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VSH Realty, Inc. re #7 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Leibowitz, Allison)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by VSH Realty, Inc.. (Leibowitz, Allison)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VSH Realty, Inc. re #5 Answer to Complaint (Leibowitz, Allison)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by VSH Realty, Inc..(Leibowitz, Allison)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VSH Realty, Inc. re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, (Leibowitz, Allison)
March 6, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for VSH Realty, Inc. answer due 3/12/2020. (dpk)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS/COMPLAINT filed by VSH Realty, Inc. (dpk)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Rensselaer, case number 2019-264904 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5051654) filed by VSH Realty, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. VSH Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany A. Boyd
Represented By: Carolyn B. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VSH Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Cory Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?