Balabala v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Phil Charleston E. Balabala
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00295
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-03228, filed 05/12/2020. (plp)
May 6, 2020 Case transferred electronically to Northern District of California for inclusion into MDL-2741 Roundup Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Vince Chhabria, U.S. District Court. (plp)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #207. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of California for inclusion into MDL-2741 Roundup Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Vince Chhabria, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
April 27, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Monsanto Company answer due 5/12/2020. (khr)
April 25, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Comlaint served on Larry Hartstein on 04/23/2020, filed by Phil Charleston E. Balabala. (Rheingold, Paul)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/22/2020 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/15/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (khr)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5062071) filed by Phil Charleston E. Balabala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balabala v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Charleston E. Balabala
Represented By: Paul D. Rheingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?