North Brevard County Hospital District v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: North Brevard County Hospital District
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Access Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00363
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Robert S. Berry. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: complete Attorney Registration Form; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
April 2, 2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Devin Freedman. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Devin Freedman Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5077022. filed by North Brevard County Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Fenlon Sponsor Declaration, #2 Petition for Admission, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 EFiling Registration, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Fenlon, Christopher)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice (Robert S. Berry) Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5077000. filed by North Brevard County Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Fenlon Sponsor Declaratio, #2 Petition for Admission, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 EFiling Registration, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Fenlon, Christopher)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney R. Stephen Berry, Email address is sberry@berrylawpllc.com. Phone number is (202)296-3020. Attorney Velvel (Devin) Freedman, Email address is vel@rcfllp.com. Phone number is (646) 350-0527. Admissions due by 4/15/2020. [Clerk served notice by email to attorneys.](sfp, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/23/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bard Access Systems, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sfp, )
April 1, 2020 Notice re: Compliance with General Order #12: Pursuant to General Order #12, counsel is required to file the Notice of Related Case form as a separate document. Refer to the Court's website: www.nynd.uscourts.gov for further instructions. Counsel may access the fillable form using the following link: www.nynd.uscourts.gov/content/general-order-12 (sfp, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North Brevard County Hospital District. (sfp, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Bard Access Systems, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 5076072) filed by North Brevard County Hospital District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Brevard County Hospital District v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Brevard County Hospital District
Represented By: Christopher V. Fenlon
Represented By: Edward J. Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Access Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?