Berka v. Cuomo
Plaintiff: George Berka
Defendant: Andrew M. Cuomo
Case Number: 1:2020cv00516
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The parties' briefing on plaintiff's #11 motion for default judgment is STAYED pending the disposition of defendant's #10 letter-request to vacate the Clerk's entry of default. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 7/1/2020. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal )
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 Letter Request/Motion from Pro Se Litigant George Berka requesting to participate in electronic filing submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (jel, )
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Andrew M. Cuomo filed by George Berka. (jel, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 Letter Motion from Joshua Tallent for Andrew M. Cuomo requesting vacatur of notice of default submitted to Judge Suddaby . (Tallent, Joshua)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Tallent on behalf of Andrew M. Cuomo (Tallent, Joshua)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Andrew M. Cuomo (Copy served via regular mail) (jel, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Andrew M. Cuomo by George Berka. (jel, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and General Order 25 served on Leah Spoltore, Executive Assistant on 5/19/2020, filed by George Berka. (jel, )
May 22, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Andrew M. Cuomo answer due 6/9/2020. (jel, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and General Order 25 served on Leah Spoltore,Executive Assistant on 5/19/2020 filed by George Berka. (jel, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at time complaint was filed (dpk)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Cuomo. (dpk)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/3/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.)(dpk)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Cuomo (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALB011756) filed by George Berka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berka v. Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Cuomo
Represented By: Joshua Tallent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Berka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?