Jafarallie et al v. The American Baler Co.
Plaintiff: Hackim Jafarallie and Roopwattie Jafarallie
Defendant: The American Baler Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00520
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer to Third Party Complaint served on Plaintiff and Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff on July 1, 2020, filed by Cascades Holding US, Inc., Cascades NEW YORK, INC., Cascades Recovery +. (McNamara, Matthew)
July 1, 2020 Filing 25 Third Party Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint of Third Party Plaintiff by Cascades Holding US, Inc., Cascades NEW YORK, INC., Cascades Recovery +.(McNamara, Matthew)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Raymond Jamieson, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/23/2020. (tab)
June 23, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Raymond Jamieson Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5152051. filed by The American Baler Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Petition for Admission, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B - MHB Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C - E-Filing Registration Form, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D - Cert of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Bai, Michael-Hong)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sara Scullen, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/12/2020. (tab)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric Matzke, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 6/12/2020. (tab)
June 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sara Scullen Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5140456. filed by The American Baler Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Petition for Admission, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B - MHB Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C - E-Filing Registration Form, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D - Cert of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Bai, Michael-Hong)
June 10, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric Matzke Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5140375. filed by The American Baler Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Petition for Admission, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B - MHB Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C - Registration Form, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D - Cert of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Bai, Michael-Hong)
June 10, 2020 ***Answer deadline set for Cascades Holding US, Inc., Cascades NEW YORK, INC., and Cascades Recovery to 6/22/2020. (jmb)
June 8, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on Cascades Recovery US, Inc. served on NY Secretary of State on 06/01/2020, filed by The American Baler Co.. (Bai, Michael-Hong)
June 8, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on Cascades New York, Inc. served on NY Secretary of State on 06/01/2020, filed by The American Baler Co.. (Bai, Michael-Hong)
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint on Cascades Holding US, Inc. served on NY Secretary of State on 06/01/2020, filed by The American Baler Co.. (Bai, Michael-Hong)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Letter Request from Benjamin W. Hill for Hackim Jafarallie, Roopwattie Jafarallie requesting Adjournment of Rule 16 Conference. The Initial Conference is adjourned and reset for Wednesday, 8/26/2020 @ 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/19/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.). Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/26/2020. (tab)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 Letter Motion from Benjamin W. Hill for Hackim Jafarallie, Roopwattie Jafarallie requesting Adjournment of Rule 16 Conference submitted to Judge Hummel . (Hill, Benjamin)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Third Party Defendant Cascades NEW YORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for Third Party Defendant Cascades Recovery +, #2 Summons issued for Third Party Defendant Cascades Holdings US, Inc) (jmb)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): The American Baler Co. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #9 Third Party Complaint, (Bai, Michael-Hong)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): The American Baler Co. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #9 Third Party Complaint, (Bai, Michael-Hong)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): The American Baler Co. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #9 Third Party Complaint, (Bai, Michael-Hong)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Cascades NEW YORK, INC., Cascades Recovery +, Cascades Holding US, Inc. filed by The American Baler Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Answer to Complaint)(Bai, Michael-Hong)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W. Hill on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hill, Benjamin)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The American Baler Co. re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, (Bai, Michael-Hong)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by The American Baler Co..(Bai, Michael-Hong)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael-Hong Sik Bai on behalf of The American Baler Co. (Bai, Michael-Hong)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The American Baler Co. identifying Corporate Parent Avis Industrial Corporation for The American Baler Co... (Bai, Michael-Hong)
May 8, 2020 ***Answer due date set for The American Baler Co. answer due 5/14/2020. (kmp)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In Person Rule 16 Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/1/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to the #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The American Baler Co. (kmp)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albany County Supreme Court, case number 903066-20 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5112001) filed by The American Baler Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jafarallie et al v. The American Baler Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hackim Jafarallie
Represented By: Donald W. Boyajian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roopwattie Jafarallie
Represented By: Donald W. Boyajian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Baler Co.
Represented By: Michael-Hong Sik Bai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?