Todd v. Dribusch et al
Appellee: Christian H. Dribusch and Endurance American Insurance Company
Appellant: Laurie A. Todd
Case Number: 1:2020cv00612
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 U.S. Postal RETURN RECEIPT - Certified Mail - received as to Laurie A. Todd as to #4 Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal and Certificate of Non-Compliance served on Laurie Todd. (hmr)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING BANKRUPTCY APPEAL. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 7/6/20. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Non-compliance)(copies served upon upon Ms. Todd via regular and certified mail and Bankruptcy Trustee via regular mail)(ban)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Non Compliance)(usbcns, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to Laurie A. Todd on 6/4/2020 by regular mail. (see)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal filed by Laurie A. Todd with the Bankruptcy Court on 6/2/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number 15-11083. (Attachments: #1 5/29/2020 Memorandum-Decision and Order)(usbcns, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Dribusch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Christian H. Dribusch
Represented By: Christian H. Dribusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Endurance American Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin S. Brotspies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Laurie A. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?