Myanmar Asian Inc. v. United States of America Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service
Plaintiff: Myanmar Asian Inc.
Defendant: United States of America Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service
Case Number: 1:2020cv00765
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 07:2023
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for United States of America Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service answer due 10/20/2020. (khr)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney General, US Department of Agriculture, US Attorney for NDNY on August 21, 2020, filed by Myanmar Asian Inc.. (Schillinger, Eric)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to US Attorney, #2 Summons issued to US Attorney General)(khr)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Myanmar Asian Inc. is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Schillinger, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2020: #3 Proposed Summons - US Attorney General) (khr, ).
July 10, 2020 TEXT NOTICE: File the summonses under Request for Issuance of Summons(es) found under Civil - Initial Pleadings and Service - Service of Process. (khr)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against United States of America Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service (Filing fee $400 receipt number BNYNDC-5167801) filed by Myanmar Asian Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myanmar Asian Inc. v. United States of America Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myanmar Asian Inc.
Represented By: Eric K. Schillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?