McIver v. Genesa Home Care
Plaintiff: Tamicko Murray McIver
Defendant: Unknown Name husband of owner, Martha Owner/Founder and Genesa Home Care
Case Number: 1:2020cv00939
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-06071. electronically transferred when case opened
August 10, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: Plaintiff has consented to electronic service of Court documents. (ECF 2.) The Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/10/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Tamicko Murray McIver consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Tamicko Murray McIver.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Genesa Home Care, Martha owner/founder, Unknown Name husband of owner. Document filed by Tamicko Murray McIver.(rdz) Modified on 8/5/2020 (rdz). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIver v. Genesa Home Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamicko Murray McIver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Name husband of owner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Owner/Founder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesa Home Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?