Deer Mountain Inn LLC v. Union Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Deer Mountain Inn LLC
Defendant: Union Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00984
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Bernstein on behalf of All Defendants (Bernstein, Jonathan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A. Weiss on behalf of Deer Mountain Inn LLC (Weiss, Stephen)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Based upon the agreement of the parties, the deadline in which Defendant, Union Insurance Company, is to respond to Complaint in this matter is extended to October 23, 2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 9/23/2020. (mab)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 Letter Motion from Chris Paparella for Union Insurance Company requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Stipulation for Extension of Time)(Paparella, Christopher)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Reich on behalf of Deer Mountain Inn LLC (Reich, Mark)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Cecchi on behalf of Deer Mountain Inn LLC (Cecchi, James)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Class Action Compliant, Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice - Civil Case Management Plan served on Phil Marlow, Facilities Services Manager on September 2, 2020, filed by Deer Mountain Inn LLC. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO #7 Notice of Admission Requirement filed by Deer Mountain Inn LLC. Attorney Stephen Weiss will be remaining as counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(see)
September 9, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Union Insurance Company answer due 9/23/2020. (see)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Deer Mountain Inn LLC Regarding Appearance of James E. Cecchi (Taylor, Lindsey)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Letter advising Court that Attorney Mark S. Reich will remain as counsel for pltf. (see)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Taylor on behalf of Deer Mountain Inn LLC (Taylor, Lindsey)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #4 and #5 Notices of Admission Requirements filed by Deer Mountain Inn LLC. Stuart Davidson will be remaining as counsel of record and Paul Geller will not remain as counsel of record. (see)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Deer Mountain Inn LLC; Attorney Stephen A. Weiss. Phone number is 212-584-0700. Admissions due by 9/8/2020. {Mailed to Attorney Weiss on 8/25/2020 by regular mail}(see)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Deer Mountain Inn LLC; Attorney James E. Cecchi. Phone number is 973-994-1700. Admissions due by 9/8/2020. {Mailed to Attorney Cecchi on 8/25/2020 by regular mail}(see)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Deer Mountain Inn LLC; Attorney Stuart A. Davidson. Phone number is 561-750-3000. Admissions due by 9/8/2020. {Mailed to Attorney Davidson on 8/25/2020 by regular mail} (see)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Deer Mountain Inn LLC; Attorney Paul J. Geller. Phone number is 561-750-3000. Admissions due by 9/8/2020. {Mailed to Attorney Geller on 8/25/2020 by regular mail}(see)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/16/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Union Insurance Company. (see)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Union Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5216001) filed by Deer Mountain Inn LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deer Mountain Inn LLC v. Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deer Mountain Inn LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Seeger
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lindsey Taylor
Represented By: Mark S. Reich
Represented By: Stephen A. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Paparella
Represented By: Jonathan M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?