Johnson v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vanesha Johnson
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. and Coopersurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01019
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
2 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Hammers Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5297322. filed by Vanesha Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Kassan, Randi)
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Littrell, Rex)
October 23, 2020 Filing 23 JPMDL NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION. This case is included in the Hearing Session on MDL-2974 Paragard IUD Products Liability Litigation, scheduled for 12/3/2020, 9:30 a.m. (Issued by the Clerk of the MDL Panel). (plp)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION RESPONSE DEADLINE. Pursuant to the Order of the Hon. David N. Hurd, USDJ, Granting #21 Second MOTION extending time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Vanesha Johnson. The Parties' consent motion to extend time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants The Cooper Companies, Inc. and CooperSurgical, Inc. motion to dismiss Doc. #14 having come before the Court, and just cause having been shown, said motion is GRANTED and it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff will have seven (7) days to respond to the Defendants motions to dismiss should this Court deny plaintiffs motion requesting a stay in this matter pending the decision of the JPML on consolidation and transfer of this matter. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 10/19/2020. (ptm)
October 16, 2020 Filing 21 Second MOTION extending time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Vanesha Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Kassan, Randi)
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel Response to Motion due by 11/2/2020 filed by Vanesha Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s)) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Kassan, Randi)
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Rex Allen Littrell on behalf of Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Littrell, Rex)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rex A. Littrell, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 10/14/2020. (tab)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL - That, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned disqualifies himself from presiding over this matter. That the Clerk shall reassign this matter to another District Judge. That the case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge David N. Hurd. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 10/14/2020. (jel, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rex A. Littrell Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5278883. filed by Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Verified Petition for Admission, #2 Declaration of Sponsor, #3 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #4 Certificates of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Kaufman, Steven)
October 7, 2020 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #14 MOTION to Dismiss : Response to Motion due by 10/19/2020. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/26/2020. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on SUBMIT only. No personal appearances are needed.(jel, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vanguard Group, Inc. and identifying The Cooper Companies, Inc. for Coopersurgical, Inc. (Kaufman, Steven) Modified on 10/5/2020 (mgh).
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Coopersurgical, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit) (Kaufman, Steven)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC.. (Kaufman, Steven)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Kaufman, Steven)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Teva Women's Health, LLC.(Kaufman, Steven)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Teva Women's Health, Inc..(Kaufman, Steven)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION- Copy of Motion of Plaintiff for Transfer of Actions (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mgh)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. served on Curtis Sweltz, Project Manager on 9/09/2020, filed by Vanesha Johnson. (Kassan, Randi)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC served on Curtis Sweltz, Project Manager on 9/09/2020, filed by Vanesha Johnson. (Kassan, Randi)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC served on Curtis Sweltz, Project Manager on 9/09/2020, filed by Vanesha Johnson. (Kassan, Randi)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint CooperSurgical, Inc. served on Lynanne Gares, Litigation Specialist Service Leader on 09/09/2020, filed by Vanesha Johnson. (Kassan, Randi)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint The Cooper Companies, Inc. served on Lynanne Gares, Litigation Specialist Service Leader on 9/09/2020, filed by Vanesha Johnson. (Kassan, Randi)
September 29, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Coopersurgical, Inc. answer due 9/30/2020; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. answer due 9/30/2020; Teva Women's Health, Inc. answer due 9/30/2020; Teva Women's Health, LLC answer due 9/30/2020; The Cooper Companies, Inc. answer due 9/30/2020. (mgh)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/30/2020 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/23/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Coopersurgicial, Inc., #2 Summons Issued as to The Cooper Companies, Inc., #3 Summons Issued as to Teva Women's Health, Inc., #4 Summons Issued as to Teva Women's Health, LLC)(mgh)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coopersurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5224623) filed by Vanesha Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven S Kaufman
Represented By: Rex Allen Littrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Steven S Kaufman
Represented By: Rex Allen Littrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC
Represented By: Steven S Kaufman
Represented By: Rex Allen Littrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Steven S Kaufman
Represented By: Rex Allen Littrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Represented By: Steven S Kaufman
Represented By: Rex Allen Littrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanesha Johnson
Represented By: Randi A. Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?