Colony Insurance Company v. Beacon Merchant Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Colony Insurance Company
Defendant: Beacon Merchant Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01020
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving #8 Stipulation filed by Beacon Merchant Construction, Inc., Answer due date updated for Beacon Merchant Construction, Inc. answer due 11/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 10/13/2020. (tab)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extend time for Defendant to answer or respond to the Complaint by Beacon Merchant Construction, Inc. submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel. (Santiago, Fernando)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando Santiago on behalf of Beacon Merchant Construction, Inc. (Santiago, Fernando)
October 6, 2020 ***Answer deadline set for Beacon Merchant Construction, Inc. to 10/9/2020. (jmb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for DJ Complaint served on Colleen Banahan on 9/18/2020, filed by Colony Insurance Company. (Rolle, Lisa)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER filed by Jonathan R. Harwood, Esq., on behalf of Colony Insurance Company in response to the #4 Notice of Admission Requirement, advising the Court that he is currently seeking admission and will remain as counsel of record. (jmb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Jonathan R. Harwood, Esq., Phone number is 914-347-2600. Admissions due by 9/15/2020. {Copy served upon Attorney Harwood by regular mail}(jmb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/23/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Beacon Merchant Construction, Inc. (jmb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: against Beacon Merchant Construction, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5225505) filed by Colony Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colony Insurance Company v. Beacon Merchant Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colony Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa M. Rolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Merchant Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Fernando Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?