Nalley v. Rensselaer County et al
Appellee: United States Trustee, Collar City Auctions & Realty & Management, Inc. and Rensselaer County
Appellant: Steven B. Nalley
Case Number: 1:2020cv01050
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL - ORDERED, that the within appeal be and hereby is dismissed unless the Appellant within 30 days of the date of this Order fully complies with Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure which requires Appellant to file with the U.S. Bankruptcy Court Clerk and serve a copy on the appellee a designation of the items/documents to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 10/22/2020. (Copy served via regular mail on non cm/ecf parties)(jel, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL filed by Dawn Simmons, Chief Deputy Clerk.(Attachments: #1 Public Docket, #2 Order, #3 Notice of Appeal, #4 Appeal Cover Letter, #5 Court Certificate of Mailing, #6 Certification of Non Compliance)(usbcds)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to the Appellant. (jel, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal filed with the Bankruptcy Court by Stephen B. Nalley. Bankruptcy Court Case Number 20-10956. (Attachments: #1 Order Denying Motion)(usbcns, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nalley v. Rensselaer County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Andrea E. Celli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Collar City Auctions & Realty & Management, Inc.
Represented By: Marc S. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rensselaer County
Represented By: Carl John Kempf, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Steven B. Nalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?