Russell v. HealthAlliance Hospital Broadway Campus et al
Plaintiff: Sherry Russell
Defendant: Ciox Health, LLC and HealthAlliance Hospital Broadway Campus
Case Number: 1:2020cv01204
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: approving the #16 Stipulation. Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by 12/17/2020. The time for Ciox Health, LLC and HealthAlliance Hospital Broadway Campus to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 1/19/2021. A joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/26/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 Conference is rescheduled to 2/2/2021 at 10:30 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 3362194 to connect to the conference. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/5/2020. (nmk)
November 4, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Amend and for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint by Ciox Health, LLC submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Bendheim, Gilad)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/25/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 12/2/2020 at 10:30 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 3362194 to connect to the conference. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/14/2020. (nmk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: approving the #11 Stipulation. The time for defendant HealthAlliance Hospital Broadway Campus to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 11/13/2020. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/14/2020. (nmk)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the deadline for Ciox Health LLC to respond to the Complaint to 11/13/2020. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/13/2020. (Baxter, Andrew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Ciox Health, LLC submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Bendheim, Gilad)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint to November 13, 2020 by HealthAlliance Hospital Broadway Campus submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Gagliardi, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Gagliardi on behalf of HealthAlliance Hospital Broadway Campus (Gagliardi, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by HealthAlliance Hospital Broadway Campus re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Consent to and Joinder in Removal (Gagliardi, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: granting #6 Letter Request for an extension of time. The time for defendant Ciox Health, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 10/21/2020. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/7/2020. (nmk)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilad Bendheim on behalf of Ciox Health, LLC (Bendheim, Gilad)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Jay P. Lefkowitz for Ciox Health, LLC requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Lefkowitz, Jay)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay P Lefkowitz, I on behalf of Ciox Health, LLC (Lefkowitz, Jay)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 10:00 AM, by telephone, unless the parties are specifically directed to appear, before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/26/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Ciox Health, LLC; Attorney Gilad Bendheim, Email address is gilad.bendheim@kirkland.com. Phone number is (212) 446-4800. Admissions due by 10/15/2020. {Emailed to Attorney on 10/1/2020}(see)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Ulster County, case number EF2020-2203 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5262706) filed by Ciox Health, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. HealthAlliance Hospital Broadway Campus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciox Health, LLC
Represented By: Jay P Lefkowitz, I
Represented By: Gilad Bendheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthAlliance Hospital Broadway Campus
Represented By: Daniel Gagliardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Russell
Represented By: John H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?