Hamel et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Hamel and Carol Hamel
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01240
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
2 Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The request in Stipulation #17 is GRANTED. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by December 14, 2020. All other schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/2/2020.(jdp )
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION and Consent Order Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric. (Kabbash, Maha)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Katz Gerstel on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gerstel, Diana)
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Maha M. Kabbash on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Kabbash, Maha)
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Crawford, Kelly)
October 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly S. Crawford on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Crawford, Kelly)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, CCS & General Order #25 served on Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. on 10/21/2020, filed by Carol Hamel, Jerry Hamel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proof of Service of Defendants' by Electronic Mail)(Lizik, Dana)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Lizik on behalf of Carol Hamel, Jerry Hamel (Lizik, Dana)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/26/2020. (jdp, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 Supplemental Admission documents re: #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)(Lizik, Dana)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/30/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {The Clerk notes that the previous Rule 16 conference that was set before Judge Stewart in this case has been cancelled as the case has been reassigned to Judge Lovric.} (jmb)
October 23, 2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Dana Lizik. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court, a completed Petition for Admission to Practice form; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: The Court finds that this case which was randomly assigned to U.S. District Judge Lawrence E. Kahn and U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart is related to: 3:19-CV-1372 (LEK/ML). In the interest of judicial economy, the Court finds that this new action should be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 10/22/2020. (jmb)
October 22, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: The Clerk has terminated the #5 Pre Letter Motion event as it was filed in error. This is not a Judge D'Agostino case and that event is intended for her cases. The PDF images are duplicates of the #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. (jmb)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dana Lizik Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5287237. filed by Carol Hamel, Jerry Hamel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of sponsor, #2 Exhibit(s) Good Standing Certificate, #3 Proposed Order/Judgment, #4 Exhibit(s) New Attorney Registration form) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Farnolo, Nicholas)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 Pre-Motion Letter by Carol Hamel, Jerry Hamel requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 11/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of sponsor, #2 Declaration Good Standing Certificate, #3 Proposed Order/Judgment, #4 New Attorney Registration form)(Farnolo, Nicholas) Modified on 10/22/2020 to terminate this motion as it was filed in error, the wrong event was selected. PDF images are duplicated in docket entry # 6. (jmb)
October 9, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: the Clerk has replaced the pdf image of the #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, with the version that correctly notes the Rule 16 conference date of January 6, 2021 not 2020. The docket event was entered correction but the image contained a typo. {GO 25 event service will be regenerated to serve the corrected document upon counsel} (jmb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiffs'; Attorney Dana Lizik, Esq., Email address is dlizik@johnsonlawgroup.com. Phone number is 713-626-9336. Admissions due by 10/22/2020. {Copy served upon Attorney Lizik by email} (jmb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/30/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/9/2020) (jmb, ).
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Sumons issued for Johnson and Johnson)(jmb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: against Ethicon, Inc., and Johnson & Johnson (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5272540) filed by Jerry Hamel, Carol Hamel. {Albany County is the basis of jursidiction as that is where the surgery was performed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamel et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hamel
Represented By: Nicholas R. Farnolo
Represented By: Dana Lizik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Hamel
Represented By: Nicholas R. Farnolo
Represented By: Dana Lizik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?