Godin v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Allison Godin
Defendant: Ethicon Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01321
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly S. Crawford on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Crawford, Kelly)
October 23, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Maha M. Kabbash on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Kabbash, Maha)
October 23, 2020 Filing 58 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gerstel, Diana)
October 23, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Withdrawal of Counsel (Gerstel, Diana)
October 23, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Katz Gerstel on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gerstel, Diana)
October 23, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants'; Attorney Christy D. Jones, Esq., 601/948-5711, Email: christy.jones@butlersnow.com; Kari L. Sutherland, Esq., Telephone 901/680-7354, Email: kari.sutherland@butlersnow.com; William Gage, Esq., Telephone 601/985-4561, Email: william.gage@butlersnow.com; David B. Thomas, Esq., Telephone 304/414-1800, Email: dthomas@tcspllc.com; Susan M. Robinson, Esq., Telephone 304/414-1800, Email: srobinson@tcspllc.com. Admissions due by 11/6/2020. {Copy served upon attorneys' by email} (jmb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Tamara L. Banno, Esq., Email: tbanno@freeseandgoss.com and Tim K. Goss, Esq., Email: Goss39587@aol.com. Phone number is 214-761-6610. Admissions due by 11/6/2020. {Copy served upon attorneys by email} (jmb)
October 23, 2020 Filing 53 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-06316. electronically transferred when case opened
October 15, 2020 Filing 52 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #43 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7993) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8206) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 51 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #43 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2044) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2044) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2045) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2183) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2235) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2907) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7988) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8204) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Nicolette Horbach.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 50 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #43 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) - Defs' Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Tim Ulatowski.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8041) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8191) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 49 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #43 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3617) - Pls' Mot to Exclude John Wagner.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3618) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude John Wagner.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3851) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude John Wagner.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (4920) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude John Wagner.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (4876) - Pls' Mot to Exclude John Wagner.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (4879) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude John Wagner.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (5044) - Pls' Reply to Mot to Exclude John Wagner.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8011) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude John Wagner.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8232) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude John Wagner.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 48 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #43 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3671) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Harvey Winkler.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3675) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Harvey Winkler.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3784) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Harvey Winkler.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3863) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Harvey Winkler.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8012) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Harvey Winkler.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8198) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Harvey Winkler.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 47 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #43 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1977) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1981) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2100) - Defs' Mot to Substitute Amended Exhibit A to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2164) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2210) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (4574) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 1 - Pls' resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 2 - Pls' resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (4692) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (7980) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8142) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 46 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #43 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8053) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8156) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 45 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #43 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2029) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2031) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2169) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2212) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2832) - Defs' Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2833) - Defs' Mem in Support of Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2904) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Supp Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis and Notice of Adoption.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8048) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Margolis.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8147) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Michael Margolis.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 44 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #43 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8062) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8164) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 43 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint.pdf, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint.pdf, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint.pdf, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint.pdf, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint.pdf)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/16/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 10/23/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/22/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/9/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #39 Response In Opposition. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #38 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J - K)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE by Allison Godin in opposition to #36 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Michael Thomas Margolis (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Goss, Tim) (Modified on 5/24/2019 to remove link to #37 Memorandum In Support) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE by Allison Godin in opposition to #34 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Goss, Tim) (Modified on 5/24/2019 to remove link to #35 memorandum of law) (msa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 12, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #36 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Michael Thomas Margolis (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 12, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case-Specific Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Michael Thomas Margolis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #34 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family on dates and times to be determined (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 31 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Kenya K. Cain, M.D.. (Goss, Tim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Michael Thomas Margolis on 4/13/19 at 4:00 p.m. PDT (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 29 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Allison Godin of Kenya K. Cain, MD on April 23, 2019 at 9:00 am (EST) (Goss, Tim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 28 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Kenya K. Cain, M.D.. (Goss, Tim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Daniel Godin on 3/10/19 at 1:00 pm CST (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Allison Godin on 3/10/19 at 9:00 am CST (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Daniel Godin on 3/10/19 at 1:00 pm CST (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Allison Godin of Kenya K. Cain, MD on April 1, 2019 at 9:00 AM (EST) (Goss, Tim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allison Godin for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Goss, Tim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Daniel Godin on 02/28/19 at 1:00 p.m. CST (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 21 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Allison Godin on 02/28/19 at 9:00 a.m. CST (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Allison Godin on 02/28/19 at 9:00 a.m. CST (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Allison Godin on 2/28/19 at 9:00 a.m. (MST) (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for Second Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Allison Godin. (Goss, Tim) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Allison Godin of Kenya K. Cain, M.D. on 2/26/2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Goss, Tim) (Modified on 11/7/2018 to convert event to notice to take or amend deposition) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER # 320 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 10 Cases) The cases on Exhibits A are: 1.) removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2.) placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1.) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2.) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3.) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and 4.) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 10 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 10 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 11/15/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due 11/22/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due 12/21/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 02/22/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 03/22/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 03/29/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 04/29/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 05/13/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 06/03/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 05/13/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 06/03/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3.) Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 03/25/2019, and any response is due by 04/09/2019. Any reply is due by 04/15/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Civil Rule 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1.) Venue Recommendations. By no later than 04/06/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 04/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/31/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 10 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (kab) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 3/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/19/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (mks) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 7/1/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 2900 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/24/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting MOTION by Tim K. Goss, Tamara L. Banno, John Harloe, Yvette Diaz and Freese & Goss, PLLC for Change of Address filed in MDL 2327. The Clerk is DIRECTED to update the firm address, as set forth in the Motion, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Tim K. Goss, Tamara L. Banno, John Harloe, and Yvette Diaz are associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (jk) (Modified date filed on 5/25/2016) (klc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
September 15, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 11, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
July 6, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 19, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 178 (Initial Order Regarding Severance of Actions) entered on 05/14/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 15, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3898775. (Severed from Civil Action No. 2:14-cv-3955). (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godin v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Godin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc.
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?