The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company v. Erie Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Erie Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01408
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ***Answer due date updated for Erie Insurance Company answer due 12/15/2020. (pjh, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet and Scheduling Order served on New York State Department of Financial Services on 11/24/20, filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Gross, Amy)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy C Gross on behalf of The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company (Gross, Amy)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (see)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/9/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Erie Insurance Company. (pjh, )
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against Erie Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5317781) filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The Erie Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Subcontract, #3 Exhibit C - Correspondence dated 3/30/2015, #4 Exhibit D - Correspondence dated 3/27/2017, #5 Exhibit E - Correspondence dated 7/5/2017, #6 Exhibit F - Correspondence dated 7/28/2017, #7 Exhibit G - Correspondence dated 8/1/2017, #8 Exhibit H - Correspondence dated 5/16/2018, #9 Exhibit I - Correspondence dated 5/22/2018, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company v. Erie Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Represented By: Amy C Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?