Continental Western Insurance Company v. The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Plaintiff: Continental Western Insurance Company
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01621
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving Stipulation of Discontinuance, without costs to any party as against any other, with prejudice only as to the claims asserting additional insured coverage, and without prejudice as to all other claims, and without waiver of any of plaintiff's rights to seek reimbursement from The Travelers Indemnity Company of America ("Travelers") forcosts, expenses, and attorneys' fees incurred by plaintiff in the defense its insured, Highbridge Broadway, LLC ("Highbridge") in the underlying civil action titled Larry Cote v. Highbridge Broadway, LLC and Plank, LLC, pending in New York State Supreme Court, Schenectady County, under Index No.: 2017-2241 (the "Cote Action"), and without prejudice or waiver of plaintiff's right to seek reimbursement from Travelers for any indemnity payments made by plaintiff on behalf of Highbridge in the Cote Action. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/16/2021. (sal)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Barclay, Kathleen)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the dispositive motion. (tab)
January 12, 2021 TEXT NOTICE re Motion #4 to Dismiss: Response to Motion remains due by 1/26/2021. Any reply to this motion remains due by 2/2/2021. This motion is taken on submission of the papers and returnable before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. No appearances are required. (sal)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion due by 1/26/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/2/2021 filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Meg R. Reid, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit(s) 1- Complaint) (Reid, Meg)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/26/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) [Copy served upon plaintiff's attorney via regular mail on 12/30/2020](kmc)
December 30, 2020 ***Answer due date set for The Travelers Indemnity Company of America answer due 1/5/2021. (kmc)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (kmc)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Schenectady County Supreme Court, case number 2020-1879 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5365228) filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Western Insurance Company v. The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Western Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen A. Barclay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?