Shapiro v. Dr. Timothy Maggs Chiropractic, P.C.
Plaintiff: Neil R. Shapiro
Defendant: Dr. Timothy Maggs Chiropractic, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00056
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright. (Served AO 121 to the Register of Copyrights by regular mail). (sal )
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, attorneys' fees and expenses. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/26/2021. (sal)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Neil R. Shapiro (Dunne, Joseph)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Dr. Timothy Maggs Chiropractic, P.C. answer deadline is extended and is now set for 3/18/2021. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 2/5/2021. (tab)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Response to Motion due by 2/26/2021 filed by Neil R. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Dunne, Joseph)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil R. Shapiro. (Dunne, Joseph)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil R. Shapiro. Dr. Timothy Maggs Chiropractic, P.C. served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Dunne, Joseph)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s) (Mailed on January 15, 2021) (jel, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/7/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jel, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Dr. Timothy Maggs Chiropractic, P.C.. (jel, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (Injunctive Relief Demanded) & JURY DEMAND against Dr. Timothy Maggs Chiropractic, P.C. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5383569) filed by Neil R. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shapiro v. Dr. Timothy Maggs Chiropractic, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Timothy Maggs Chiropractic, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil R. Shapiro
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Represented By: Joseph Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?