Oriska Corporation v. Niskayuna Operating Co., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Oriska Corporation
Defendant: Roberta Reardon, Grandview Brokerage, Inc., John Doe, Ira Lipsius, Broad Coverage Services, Inc., Wolf Eisenbach, Rashbi Management, Inc., National Financial Service, Cullen and Dykman, LLP, Financial Service, Raphael A. Weitzner, Michael Schweimmer, Alexi Arias, Martha Lees, Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP, Oriska Insurance Company, Sam Schlesinger, Howard A. Zucker, M.D., Bent Philipson, Niskayuna Operating Co., LLC, Stella M. Vilardi, Linda A. Lacewell, The Schlesinger Family Trust, Allstate ASO, Inc., Isaac Muller, Israel Zeigelman, Carolyn Robinson, Karen Grant Williams, Dr. Merryl H. Tisch, Berkshire Group, Inc., Michael Camilleri, The Philipson Family Trust, Martin Schwartzman, Lipsius-Benhaim Law, LLP, Benjamin Landa, Allstate Administrators, Inc., Spencer Street Realty, Scott Dietrich, Pitterman Family Trust, Andrew Cuomo, Annette Hall, Sentosacare, LLC, Peter Fountas and Donna Hodge
Case Number: 1:2021cv00109
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Letter Request re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court: It is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's request for an extension of the response/reply deadlines regarding the motion to remand, pending MDL consolidation with the EDNY, is GRANTED; The motion to remand deadlines are reset accordingly - Response to Motion due by 5/25/2021, Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/1/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/8/21. (ban)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 Letter Motion from Frank Policelli for Oriska Corporation requesting Extension submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Policelli, Frank)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 Letter Request seeking additional time to serve Defendants in this matter. Plaintiff is directed to complete service upon the remaining Defendants on or before May 4, 2021 and file proof of such service on the case docket. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/5/2021. (mab)
March 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cullen and Dykman, LLP, Niskayuna Operating Co., LLC. Motion returnable before Judge Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 3/22/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Affirmation in Support of Motion to Remand, C. Buckey, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A to Buckey Affirmation, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B to Buckey Affirmation, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C to Buckey Affirmation, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D to Buckey Affirmation, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E to Buckey Affirmation) (Buckey, Christopher)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Frank Policelli for Oriska Corporation requesting Extension submitted to Judge Stewart . (Policelli, Frank)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: On February 1, 2021, Plaintiff filed a Letter Request seeking an adjournment of the Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter and of the answer deadline. Dkt. No. #6 . The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for March 2, 2021 and the deadline for the parties to file a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date at this time. Defendants Hodge, Hall, Williams and Arias are to file a response to the Complaint by February 5, 2021 as previously set forth. Plaintiff is directed to complete service upon the remaining Defendants within thirty (30) days of the date of this Text Order and file proof of such service on the case docket. Plaintiff is directed to file a Status Report by March 5, 2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/3/2021. (mab)
February 2, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: The Clerk deleted document no. 6 from this docket, as plaintiff's counsel filed the letter in this case --it should have been filed in another case (case number and case name reflected case 19-cr-71 DNH). Counsel was emailed and directed to file the letter in the appropriate case. IN ADDITION...Due to Document No. 6 being deleted, the Clerk then changed docket entry no. 7, a letter correctly filed in this case, to document no. 6, so that the numbering on this docket is sequential. (ban)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Frank Policelli for Oriska Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Policelli, Frank) Modified on 2/2/2021 - changed case number from 7 to 6 (ban).
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (mgh)
February 1, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Allstate ASO, Inc. answer due 2/5/2021; Allstate Administrators, Inc. answer due 2/5/2021; Alexi Arias answer due 2/5/2021; Berkshire Group, Inc. answer due 2/5/2021; Broad Coverage Services, Inc. answer due 2/5/2021; Michael Camilleri answer due 2/5/2021; Cullen and Dykman, LLP answer due 2/5/2021; Andrew Cuomo answer due 2/5/2021; Scott Dietrich answer due 2/5/2021; John Doe answer due 2/5/2021; Wolf Eisenbach answer due 2/5/2021; Financial Service answer due 2/5/2021; Peter Fountas answer due 2/5/2021; Grandview Brokerage, Inc. answer due 2/5/2021; Annette Hall answer due 2/5/2021; Donna Hodge answer due 2/5/2021; Linda A. Lacewell answer due 2/5/2021; Benjamin Landa answer due 2/5/2021; Martha Lees answer due 2/5/2021; Ira Lipsius answer due 2/5/2021; Lipsius-Benhaim Law, LLP answer due 2/5/2021; Isaac Muller answer due 2/5/2021; National Financial Service answer due 2/5/2021; Niskayuna Operating Co., LLC answer due 2/5/2021; Oriska Insurance Company answer due 2/5/2021; Bent Philipson answer due 2/5/2021; Pitterman Family Trust answer due 2/5/2021; Rashbi Management, Inc. answer due 2/5/2021; Roberta Reardon answer due 2/5/2021; Carolyn Robinson answer due 2/5/2021; Sam Schlesinger answer due 2/5/2021; Martin Schwartzman answer due 2/5/2021; Michael Schweimmer answer due 2/5/2021; Sentosacare, LLC answer due 2/5/2021; Spencer Street Realty answer due 2/5/2021; The Philipson Family Trust answer due 2/5/2021; The Schlesinger Family Trust answer due 2/5/2021; Merryl H. Tisch answer due 2/5/2021; Stella M. Vilardi answer due 2/5/2021; Raphael A. Weitzner answer due 2/5/2021; Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP answer due 2/5/2021; Karen Grant Williams answer due 2/5/2021; Israel Zeigelman answer due 2/5/2021; Howard A. Zucker, M.D. answer due 2/5/2021. (mgh)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/2/2021 11:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/23/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 RELATED CASE STATEMENT by Alexi Arias, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge, Karen Grant Williams. Employer Defendants in Supreme Court Index 09877/2019 removed from Nassau County to EDNY Case 20-cv-06291. It is respectfully requested that by virtue of an application to the Multi-District Litigation Panel, the Removed Action be treated as a related case to Eastern District of New York Cases 20-cv-06291 and 20-cv-06131. (mgh)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Oriska Corporation. (mgh)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Schenectady County Supreme Court, case number EFCA2019-2470 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5400775) filed by Alexi Arias, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge, Karen Grant Williams. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oriska Corporation v. Niskayuna Operating Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grandview Brokerage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ira Lipsius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broad Coverage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolf Eisenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashbi Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Financial Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cullen and Dykman, LLP
Represented By: Christopher E. Buckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raphael A. Weitzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schweimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexi Arias
Represented By: Joseph Vincent McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oriska Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Schlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard A. Zucker, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bent Philipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niskayuna Operating Co., LLC
Represented By: Christopher E. Buckey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella M. Vilardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda A. Lacewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Schlesinger Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate ASO, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Israel Zeigelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Grant Williams
Represented By: Joseph Vincent McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Merryl H. Tisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Camilleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Philipson Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Schwartzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lipsius-Benhaim Law, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Landa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Administrators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Street Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pitterman Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Hall
Represented By: Joseph Vincent McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentosacare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Fountas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Hodge
Represented By: Joseph Vincent McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oriska Corporation
Represented By: Frank Policelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?