Minard et al v. Countryway Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Douglas G. Minard and Diane Minard
Defendant: Countryway Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00119
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Countryway Insurance Company. (Aliasso, Anneliese)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Countryway Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Virginia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Co. for Countryway Insurance Company.. (Aliasso, Anneliese)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Countryway Insurance Company.(Murad, John)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anneliese Aliasso on behalf of Countryway Insurance Company (Aliasso, Anneliese)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Murad, Jr on behalf of Countryway Insurance Company (Murad, John)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint and General Order 25 served on Countryway Insurance Company on February 23, 2021, filed by Diane Minard, Douglas G. Minard. (Crain, Jon)
February 25, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Countryway Insurance Company answer due 3/16/2021. (mgh)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Countryway Insurance Company. (mgh)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Diane Minard, Douglas G. Minard is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint (Crain, Jon)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/3/2021 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/26/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Countryway Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5403501) filed by Douglas G. Minard, Diane Minard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minard et al v. Countryway Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countryway Insurance Company
Represented By: Anneliese Aliasso
Represented By: John L. Murad, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas G. Minard
Represented By: Jon E. Crain, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Minard
Represented By: Jon E. Crain, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?