Lusk v. McNamee et al
Plaintiff: Jeanne Marie Lusk
Defendant: Michael Connors, John Privitera, Simon Ballam and Dardis McNamee
Case Number: 1:2021cv00208
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #12 is GRANTED. Defendants Simon Ballam and Dardis McNamee are directed to respond to the complaint by June 7, 2021. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/19/2021. (jdp )
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 Letter Motion from Benjamin F. Neidl, Esq. for Simon Ballam, Dardis McNamee requesting fixing of these defendants' time to answer, move against or respond to the Complaint as June 7, 2021 submitted to Judge Lovic . (Neidl, Benjamin)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin F. Neidl on behalf of Simon Ballam, Dardis McNamee (Neidl, Benjamin)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 7/14/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/7/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Dardis McNamee. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to John Privitera, #2 Summons Issued as to Michael Connors, #3 Summons Issued as to Simon Ballam)(pjh, )
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot based on Plaintiff's payment of the filing fee #7 . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/6/2021.(jdp)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Jeanne Marie Lusk withdrawing motion for IFP and paid filing fee. Receipt number 3BNG2799. (jdp )
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Defendant Privitera's Letter Motion #5 is DENIED as moot. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), the Court will (a) decide Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , and (b) review Plaintiff's Complaint and dismiss any causes of action that it finds to be frivolous or malicious, fail to state a claim on which relief may be granted, or seek monetary relief against a defendant who is immune from such relief. After the review of Plaintiff's Complaint is complete, to the extent that any causes of action survive, the Court will direct the Clerk of the Court to issue summons addressed to any remaining defendants. At this juncture, no action is required of Defendants because the Clerk of the Court has not issued any summons bearing the Court's seal or signed by the Clerk, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(a). SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/16/2021. (jdp )
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 Letter Motion from David B. Cabaniss for John Privitera requesting that the Court so-order a stipulation extending the time for Defendant John Privitera to respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Lovric . (Attachments: #1 stipulation to be so-ordered, extending the time for Defendant John Privitera to respond to the Complaint)(Cabaniss, David)
March 4, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: The Answer deadline set for John Privitera has been terminated as it was set in error. (pjh, )
March 4, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for John Privitera answer due 3/22/2021. (pjh, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons in a civil Action, Civil Cover Sheet, Application to Proceed in District Court without Paying Fees or Cost, Complaint and Jury Demand, with Exhibits served on John Privitiera on 2/27/2021, filed by Jeanne Marie Lusk. (Zack, Leonard)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 Civil RICO Statement filed by Jeanne Marie Lusk. (Zack, Leonard)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeanne Marie Lusk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Dardis McNamee, #2 Proposed Summons as to Simon Ballam, #3 Proposed Summons as to Michael Connors, #4 Proposed Summons as to John Privitera) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. (pjh, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Simon Ballam, Michael Connors, Dardis McNamee and John Privitera filed by Jeanne Marie Lusk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Medical Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 3 - Police Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 5 - Text Messages, #6 Exhibit 6 - Email Correspondence, #7 Exhibit 7 - Petition and Notice of Foreclosure, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lusk v. McNamee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Privitera
Represented By: David B. Cabaniss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Ballam
Represented By: Benjamin F. Neidl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dardis McNamee
Represented By: Benjamin F. Neidl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Marie Lusk
Represented By: Leonard Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?