Donaldson et al v. Hudson Valley Family Physicians, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Chiera and Robert Donaldson
Defendant: D.O. Amin Elashker, Hudson Valley Family Physicians, PLLC doing business as Rosendale Medical Center Urgent Care, Amen Elashker and D.O. Francesca Hilmi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00220
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Based upon the consent of the parties, Defendants' #8 Motion for an Extension of Time to file a response to the Complaint in this matter is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their response on or before May 7, 2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 4/13/2021. (mab)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed stipulation and order filed by Amin Elashker, Francesca Hilmi, Hudson Valley Family Physicians, PLLC. Response to Motion due by 5/3/2021 Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Wise, David)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Wise on behalf of All Defendants (Wise, David)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Donaldson, Patricia Chiera. Hudson Valley Family Physicians, PLLC served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Wheeler, Russell)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Donaldson, Patricia Chiera. Francesca Hilmi served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Wheeler, Russell)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Donaldson, Patricia Chiera. Amin Elashker served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Wheeler, Russell)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/20/2021. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hudson Valley Family Physicians, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued for Amin Elashker, #2 Summons issued for Francesca Hilmi)(jmb)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: against Hudson Valley Family Physicians, PLLC, Amin Elashker and Francesca Hilmi. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5436238) filed by Robert Donaldson, Patricia Chiera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donaldson et al v. Hudson Valley Family Physicians, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O. Amin Elashker
Represented By: David R. Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Valley Family Physicians, PLLC doing business as Rosendale Medical Center Urgent Care
Represented By: David R. Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amen Elashker
Represented By: David R. Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O. Francesca Hilmi
Represented By: David R. Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Chiera
Represented By: Russell G. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Donaldson
Represented By: Russell G. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?