Henry v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Co.
Plaintiff: Kathey Henry
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Co.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00227
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Consolidate Actions. The action 1:21-cv-133 shall be deemed the LEAD CASE. All other actions will be deemed MEMBER CASES. All further filings shall be made in the LEAD CASE: 1:21-cv-133. Defendant shall file an answer w/in 60 days of the filing of a Consolidated Complaint, or by 5/15/2021, whichever is later. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 3/19/2021. (amt)
March 16, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 42(a) by Kathey Henry submitted to Judge Thomas J. McAvoy. (Mason, Gary)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of David C. Magagna, Jr. Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/16/2021. (tab)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Gary M. Klinger, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/16/2021. (tab)
March 15, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of David C. Magagna, Jr. Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5457057. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Petition for Admission, #3 PA COGS, #4 Attorney Registration Form, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Mason, Gary)
March 15, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary M. Klinger Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5457041. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Petition for Admission, #3 IL COGS, #4 Attorney Registration Form, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Mason, Gary)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Livia Anne McCammon Kiser, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/15/2021. (tab)
March 11, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Livia Anne McCammon Kiser Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5454939. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form with Oath, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
March 11, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S Goldenberg on behalf of Kathey Henry (Goldenberg, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey S. Goldenberg, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/10/2021. (tab)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for David K. Lietz, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/10/2021. (tab)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beech-Nut Nutrition Co. identifying Corporate Parent Hero Beteiligungen AG, Corporate Parent Hero USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Hero AG, Corporate Parent Schwartau International GmbH, Corporate Parent AOH Nahrungsmittel GmbH & Co. KG for Beech-Nut Nutrition Co... (McCarthy, Kathleen)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. McCarthy on behalf of Beech-Nut Nutrition Co. (McCarthy, Kathleen)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey S. Goldenberg Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5450669. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Petition for Admission, #3 OH COGS, #4 Attorney Registration Form, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Mason, Gary)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of David K. Lietz Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5450573. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Petition for Admission, #3 DC COGS, #4 Attorney Registration Form, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Mason, Gary)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Schaffer on behalf of Kathey Henry (Schaffer, Charles)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Kathey Henry. Attorney Gary M. Klinger, Esq. admissions due by 3/15/2021. (dpk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Kathey Henry. Attorney Jeffrey S. Goldenberg, Esq. admissions due by 3/15/2021. (dpk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Kathey Henry. Attorney David C. Magagna Jr., Esq. admissions due by 3/15/2021. (dpk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Kathey Henry. Attorney Kevin Laukaitis admissions due by 3/15/2021. (dpk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Kathey Henry: Attorney David K. Lietz, Esq. admissions due by 3/15/2021. (dpk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Co.. (dpk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/25/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beech-Nut Nutrition Co. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5438144) filed by Kathey Henry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathey Henry
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Jeffrey S Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Co.
Represented By: Kathleen E. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?