Motherway v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Plaintiff: Michael Motherway
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00229
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Consolidate Actions. The action 1:21-cv-133 shall be deemed the LEAD CASE. All other actions will be deemed MEMBER CASES. All further filings shall be made in the LEAD CASE: 1:21-cv-133. Defendant shall file an answer w/in 60 days of the filing of a Consolidated Complaint, or by 5/15/2021, whichever is later. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 3/19/2021. (amt)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason P. Sultzer on behalf of Michael Motherway (Sultzer, Jason)
March 1, 2021 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/1/2021 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/25/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Michael Motherway; Attorney Sue J. Nam, Esq. and Carlos F. Ramirez, Esq.,. Phone number is Telephone: (212) 643-0500. Admissions due by 3/15/2021. {Notice served via regular mail} (mgh)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Michael Motherway; Attorney Joseph Lipari, Esq.,Daniel Markowitz, Esq., and Mindy Dolgoff, Esq., Email address is Liparij@TheSultzerLawGroup.com;. Phone number is (845) 483-7100. Admissions due by 3/15/2021. {Notice of Admission requirement sent via regular mail(mgh)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. (mgh)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNYNDC-5438253) filed by Michael Motherway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motherway v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech-Nut Nutrition Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Motherway
Represented By: James R. Peluso, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Reese
Represented By: Jason P. Sultzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?